McCaskill v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Kenny Lee McCaskill
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2018cv01777
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Sarah A L Merriam
Referring Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405dc
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Benil Abraham on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Abraham, Benil)
October 30, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenny Lee McCaskill. Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/30/2018, answer due 12/29/2018. Service made by Clerk via Email. (Anastasio, F.)
October 30, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Eddy Pierre Pierre* *Pierre Pierre Law, P.C.* *211 East 43rd Street, Ste 608* *New York, NY 10017*. (Anastasio, F.)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has filed a motion seeking to proceed without payment of fees and costs, which motion includes a declaration under the penalties of perjury as to plaintiff's current financial circumstances. See Doc. #2 . Plaintiff has completed the required information. He asserts that he is unable to afford to pay fees and costs, having no income or assets. See generally id. at 1-2. Plaintiff also states that he is "unemployed and disabled[.]" Id. at 1. At this stage, such allegations are sufficient to establish that plaintiff is unable to pay the ordinary filing fees required by the Court. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). Accordingly, plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 10/30/2018. (Katz, S.)
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE RE: STATISTICAL INFORMATION Signed by Clerk on 10/26/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 10/26/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 10/26/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER ON SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 10/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Fazekas, J.)
October 26, 2018 Judge Stefan R Underhill added. (Anastasio, F.)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kenny Lee McCaskill. (Pierre Pierre, Eddy)
October 26, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Pierre Pierre, Eddy)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Kenny Lee McCaskill against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Kenny Lee McCaskill. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Pierre Pierre, Eddy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCaskill v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny Lee McCaskill
Represented By: Eddy Pierre Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Benil Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?