Nathan et al v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al
Plaintiff: Lynne W. Nathan, Leslie Nathan and Lynne Nathan
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage and HSBC Bank USA, N A
Case Number: 3:2018cv01783
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Charles S Haight
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 17 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss until 01/15/2019 by Leslie Nathan, Lynne W. Nathan, Lynne Nathan. (Mira, Jennifer)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting, absent objection and for good cause shown, Plaintiffs' #15 Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, Plaintiffs must file thier response to Defendants' #13 Motion to Dismiss by or before December 29, 2018, and the parties may conduct their Rule 26(f) conference after the Court has ruled on Defendants' #13 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on 12/04/2018. (Ghosh, R.)
November 29, 2018 Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/29/2018 To File Response to Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum In Support of Motion #13 MOTION to Dismiss , #14 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by Leslie Nathan, Lynne W. Nathan, Lynne Nathan. (Mira, Jennifer)
November 20, 2018 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by HSBC Bank USA, N A, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Higgins, Sean)
November 20, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by HSBC Bank USA, N A, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage.Responses due by 12/11/2018 (Higgins, Sean)
November 8, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Mira on behalf of Leslie Nathan, Lynne W. Nathan, Lynne Nathan (Mira, Jennifer)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting, absent objection and for good cause shown, #10 Defendants' Assented-To Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Accordingly, Defendants must respond to the #1 Complaint by or before November 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on 11/06/2018. (Ghosh, R.)
November 5, 2018 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until November 21, 2018 To Respond to Complaint by HSBC Bank USA, N A, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. (Higgins, Sean)
October 31, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by HSBC Bank USA, N A, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage (Higgins, Sean)
October 31, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by HSBC Bank USA, N A, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage - STATEMENT REQUIRED BY STANDING ORDER FOR REMOVED CASES (Higgins, Sean)
October 31, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., #6 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by HSBC Bank USA, N A, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by HSBC Bank USA, N A, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by HSBC Bank USA, N A, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Signed by Clerk on 10/31/18. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Reis, Julia)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 10/30/18.(Reis, Julia)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/29/2018 Discovery due by 5/1/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 6/5/2019 Signed by Clerk on 10/30/18.(Reis, Julia)
October 30, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HSBC Bank USA, N.A. as Trustee for Wells Fargo Asset Securities Corporation, Mortgage Pass-through Certificates, Series 2007-8 identifying Corporate Parent HSBC USA, Inc., Other Affiliate HSBC Holdings plc for HSBC Bank USA, N.A. as Trustee for Wells Fargo Asset Securities Corporation, Mortgage Pass-through Certificates, Series 2007-8. (Higgins, Sean)
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Higgins, Sean)
October 30, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean R. Higgins on behalf of HSBC Bank USA, N.A. as Trustee for Wells Fargo Asset Securities Corporation, Mortgage Pass-through Certificates, Series 2007-8, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Higgins, Sean)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., HSBC Bank USA, N.A. as Trustee for Wells Fargo Asset Securities Corporation, Mortgage Pass-through Certificates, Series 2007-8 from Connecticut Superior Court for the Judicial District of Middlesex, case number MMX-CV18-6022798-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5028378, filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., HSBC Bank USA, N.A. as Trustee for Wells Fargo Asset Securities Corporation, Mortgage Pass-through Certificates, Series 2007-8. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Summons and Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Return of Service), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Higgins, Sean)
October 30, 2018 Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nathan et al v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynne W. Nathan
Represented By: Jennifer Mira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Nathan
Represented By: Jennifer Mira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynne Nathan
Represented By: Jennifer Mira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Sean R. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Represented By: Sean R. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N A
Represented By: Sean R. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?