Retail Wholesale Department Store Union Local 338 Retirement Fund v. Synchrony Financial et al
Plaintiff: Retail Wholesale Department Store Union Local 338 Retirement Fund, Stichting Depositary APG Fixed Income Credits Pool and Stichting Depositary APG Developed Markets Equity Pool
Defendant: Brian M Doubles, Synchrony Financial, Margaret M Keane, Brian D Doubles, Paget Alves, Arthur Coviello, Jr., Jeffrey Naylor, Laurel Richie, TD Securities (USA) LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Castleoak Securities, L.P., Olympia Snowe, Roy Guthrie, R. Seelaus & Co., Inc., Richard Hartnack, David Melito, Thomas M. Quindlen, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Blaylock Van, LLC, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Mischler Financial Group, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC and William Graylin
Petitioner: Danica Pension, Livsforsikringsaktieselskab, Heavy & General Laborers Local 472 & 172 Pension, Annuity and Welfare Funds and KBC Asset Management NV
Consolidated Defendant: Arthur W Coviello, Jr., Laurel J Richie, William W Graylin, Paget L Alves, Richard C Hartnack, Jeffrey G Naylor, Olympia J. Snowe and Roy A. Guthrie
Consolidated Plaintiff: Jeffrey Gilbert and Maureen Aldridge
Case Number: 3:2018cv01818
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting #102 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel Lewis. Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/8/2019. Signed by Clerk on 7/10/2019. (Fazekas, J.)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting #101 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Adam S. Hakki. Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/8/2019. Signed by Clerk on 7/10/2019. (Fazekas, J.)
July 9, 2019 Filing 111 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC identifying Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc. for Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (Cohen, Evan)
July 9, 2019 Filing 110 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mizuho Securities USA LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mizuho Americas LLC (MHA) for Mizuho Securities USA LLC. (Cohen, Evan)
July 9, 2019 Filing 109 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TD Securities (USA) LLC identifying Corporate Parent Toronto Dominion Holdings (U.S.A.), Inc. for TD Securities (USA) LLC. (Cohen, Evan)
July 9, 2019 Filing 108 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Barclays Capital Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Barclays PLC for Barclays Capital Inc.. (Cohen, Evan)
July 9, 2019 Filing 107 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Williams Capital Group, L.P.. (Cohen, Evan)
July 9, 2019 Filing 106 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blaylock Van, LLC. (Cohen, Evan)
July 9, 2019 Filing 105 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mischler Financial Group, Inc.. (Cohen, Evan)
July 9, 2019 Filing 104 Corporate Disclosure Statement by R. Seelaus & Co., Inc.. (Cohen, Evan)
July 9, 2019 Filing 103 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CastleOak Securities, L.P.. (Cohen, Evan)
July 9, 2019 Filing 102 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel Lewis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5350722) by Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Van, LLC, CastleOak Securities, L.P., Mischler Financial Group, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, R. Seelaus & Co., Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Williams Capital Group, L.P.. (Cohen, Evan)
July 9, 2019 Filing 101 MOTION for Attorney(s) Adam S. Hakki to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5350705) by Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Van, LLC, CastleOak Securities, L.P., Mischler Financial Group, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, R. Seelaus & Co., Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Williams Capital Group, L.P.. (Cohen, Evan)
June 26, 2019 Filing 100 AFFIDAVIT re #98 MOTION to Dismiss /Declaration of Jared Gerber in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint Signed By Jared Gerber filed by Paget L Alves, Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Van, LLC, CastleOak Securities, L.P., Arthur W Coviello, Jr, Brian D Doubles, William W Graylin, Roy A. Guthrie, Richard C Hartnack, Margaret M Keane, David Melito, Mischler Financial Group, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Jeffrey G Naylor, Thomas M. Quindlen, R. Seelaus & Co., Inc., Laurel J Richie, Olympia J. Snowe, Synchrony Financial, TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Williams Capital Group, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit 68, #69 Exhibit 69, #70 Exhibit 70, #71 Exhibit 71, #72 Exhibit 72, #73 Exhibit 73, #74 Exhibit 74, #75 Exhibit 75, #76 Exhibit 76, #77 Exhibit 77, #78 Exhibit 78, #79 Exhibit 79, #80 Exhibit 80)(Kotler, Meredith)
June 26, 2019 Filing 99 Memorandum in Support re #98 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Paget L Alves, Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Van, LLC, CastleOak Securities, L.P., Arthur W Coviello, Jr, Brian D Doubles, William W Graylin, Roy A. Guthrie, Richard C Hartnack, Margaret M Keane, David Melito, Mischler Financial Group, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Jeffrey G Naylor, Thomas M. Quindlen, R. Seelaus & Co., Inc., Laurel J Richie, Olympia J. Snowe, Synchrony Financial, TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Williams Capital Group, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Annex A, #2 Annex B, #3 Annex C)(Kotler, Meredith)
June 26, 2019 Filing 98 MOTION to Dismiss by Paget L Alves, Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Van, LLC, CastleOak Securities, L.P., Arthur W Coviello, Jr, Brian D Doubles, William W Graylin, Roy A. Guthrie, Richard C Hartnack, Margaret M Keane, David Melito, Mischler Financial Group, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Jeffrey G Naylor, Thomas M. Quindlen, R. Seelaus & Co., Inc., Laurel J Richie, Olympia J. Snowe, Synchrony Financial, TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Williams Capital Group, L.P..Responses due by 7/17/2019 (Kotler, Meredith)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #94 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/26/2019. (Baran, Hugh)
June 26, 2019 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan I. Cohen on behalf of Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Van, LLC, CastleOak Securities, L.P., Mischler Financial Group, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, R. Seelaus & Co., Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Williams Capital Group, L.P. (Cohen, Evan)
June 26, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Q English on behalf of Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Van, LLC, CastleOak Securities, L.P., Mischler Financial Group, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, R. Seelaus & Co., Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Williams Capital Group, L.P. (English, Michael)
June 18, 2019 Filing 94 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Paget Alves, Arthur Coviello, Jr., Brian D Doubles, William Graylin, Roy Guthrie, Richard Hartnack, Margaret M Keane, David Melito, Jeffrey Naylor, Thomas M. Quindlen, Laurel Richie, Olympia Snowe, Synchrony Financial. (Shearin, James)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting #92 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court GRANTS Defendants' motion and amends the parties' pre-trial deadlines as follows:-By June 26, 2019, Defendants shall answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint.-If Defendants move to dismiss the Amended Complaint, briefing will proceed as follows: opposition due August 21, 2019; reply due October 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 4/23/2019. (Baran, Hugh)
April 23, 2019 Answer deadline updated for All Defendants to 6/26/2019. (Baran, Hugh)
April 22, 2019 Filing 92 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 26, 2019 To Respond to Amended Complaint and Extend Pretrial Deadlines In #59 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel,,,,,,,,, #78 Amended Complaint,, by Paget Alves, Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Van, LLC, CastleOak Securities, L.P., Arthur Coviello, Jr., Brian D Doubles, William Graylin, Roy Guthrie, Richard Hartnack, Margaret M Keane, David Melito, Mischler Financial Group, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Jeffrey Naylor, Thomas M. Quindlen, R. Seelaus & Co., Inc., Laurel Richie, Olympia Snowe, Synchrony Financial, TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Williams Capital Group, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shearin, James)
April 17, 2019 Filing 91 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stichting Depositary APG Developed Markets Equity Pool, Stichting Depositary APG Fixed Income Credits Pool. Mischler Financial Group, Inc. served on 4/11/2019, answer due 5/2/2019. (Graziano, Salvatore)
April 17, 2019 Filing 90 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stichting Depositary APG Developed Markets Equity Pool, Stichting Depositary APG Fixed Income Credits Pool. TD Securities (USA) LLC served on 4/10/2019, answer due 5/1/2019. (Graziano, Salvatore)
April 17, 2019 Filing 89 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stichting Depositary APG Developed Markets Equity Pool, Stichting Depositary APG Fixed Income Credits Pool. Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC served on 4/10/2019, answer due 5/1/2019. (Graziano, Salvatore)
April 17, 2019 Filing 88 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stichting Depositary APG Developed Markets Equity Pool, Stichting Depositary APG Fixed Income Credits Pool. The Williams Capital Group, L.P. served on 4/10/2019, answer due 5/1/2019. (Graziano, Salvatore)
April 17, 2019 Filing 87 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stichting Depositary APG Developed Markets Equity Pool, Stichting Depositary APG Fixed Income Credits Pool. R. Seelaus & Co., Inc. served on 4/10/2019, answer due 5/1/2019. (Graziano, Salvatore)
April 17, 2019 Filing 86 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stichting Depositary APG Developed Markets Equity Pool, Stichting Depositary APG Fixed Income Credits Pool. CastleOak Securities, L.P. served on 4/10/2019, answer due 5/1/2019. (Graziano, Salvatore)
April 17, 2019 Filing 85 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stichting Depositary APG Developed Markets Equity Pool, Stichting Depositary APG Fixed Income Credits Pool. Blaylock Van, LLC served on 4/10/2019, answer due 5/1/2019. (Graziano, Salvatore)
April 17, 2019 Filing 84 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stichting Depositary APG Developed Markets Equity Pool, Stichting Depositary APG Fixed Income Credits Pool. Mizuho Securities USA LLC served on 4/10/2019, answer due 5/1/2019. (Graziano, Salvatore)
April 17, 2019 Filing 83 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stichting Depositary APG Developed Markets Equity Pool, Stichting Depositary APG Fixed Income Credits Pool. Barclays Capital Inc. served on 4/10/2019, answer due 5/1/2019. (Graziano, Salvatore)
April 15, 2019 Filing 82 EXHIBIT 2 Brown Law Firm Resume by Maureen Aldridge, Jeffrey Gilbert re #80 MOTION Relief from Order for Consolidation re 73 Order,,, For Consolidation and appointment of co-lead counsel for plaintiffs. (Smith, Eric)
April 15, 2019 Filing 81 EXHIBIT 1 - Rosen Law Firm Resume by Maureen Aldridge, Jeffrey Gilbert re #80 MOTION Relief from Order for Consolidation re 73 Order,,, For Consolidation and appointment of co-lead counsel for plaintiffs. (Smith, Eric)
April 12, 2019 Filing 80 MOTION Relief from Order for Consolidation re 73 Order,,, For Consolidation and appointment of co-lead counsel for plaintiffs by Maureen Aldridge, Jeffrey Gilbert.Responses due by 5/3/2019 (Smith, Eric)
April 8, 2019 Filing 79 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Paget Alves, Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Van, LLC, CastleOak Securities, L.P., Arthur W Coviello, Jr, William Graylin, Roy Guthrie, Richard Hartnack, David Melito, Mischler Financial Group, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Jeffrey Naylor, Thomas M. Quindlen, R. Seelaus & Co., Inc., Laurel Richie, Olympia Snowe, TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Williams Capital Group, L.P.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Salvatore Graziano* *Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP* *1251 Avenue of the Americas, Ste 44th Floor* *New York, NY 10020*. (Fazekas, J.)
April 8, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Paget Alves, Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Van, LLC, CastleOak Securities, L.P., Arthur Coviello, Jr., William Graylin, Roy Guthrie, Richard Hartnack, David Melito, Mischler Financial Group, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Jeffrey Naylor, Thomas M. Quindlen, R. Seelaus & Co., Inc., Laurel Richie, Olympia Snowe, TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Williams Capital Group, L.P.. (Graziano, Salvatore)
April 5, 2019 Filing 78 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Brian D Doubles, Margaret M Keane, Synchrony Financial, Thomas M. Quindlen, David Melito, Paget Alves, Arthur Coviello, Jr., William Graylin, Roy Guthrie, Richard Hartnack, Jeffrey Naylor, Laurel Richie, Olympia Snowe, Barclays Capital Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, TD Securities (USA) LLC, Blaylock Van, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Mischler Financial Group, Inc., R. Seelaus & Co., Inc., The Williams Capital Group, L.P., filed by Stichting Depositary APG Developed Markets Equity Pool, Stichting Depositary APG Fixed Income Credits Pool.(Graziano, Salvatore)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #76 Motion to Withdraw as attorney. Attorney George C. Springer, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/27/2019. (Baran, Hugh)
March 26, 2019 Filing 76 MOTION for George C. Springer, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney by Danica Pension, Livsforsikringsaktieselskab. (Springer, George)
March 25, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE OF CONSOLIDATION Signed by Clerk on 3/25/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
March 25, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE OF CONSOLIDATION Signed by Clerk on 3/25/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER: On February 5, 2019, the Court appointed Stichting Depositary APG Developed Markets Equity Pool as Lead Plaintiff in this class action brought under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act ("PSLRA"), 15 U.S.C. 78u-4. See Ruling and Order on motions to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, dated Feb. 5, 2019, ECF No. 59.Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a), the Court orders that any subsequently filed, removed, or transferred actions that are related to the claims asserted in this action are CONSOLIDATED for all purposes. Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to (1) consolidate Nos. 3:19-cv-130 (VAB) and 3:19-cv-369 (VAB) with this action; (2) to assign any related actions that are subsequently filed, removed, or transferred to this District to this Court; and (3) to consolidate any related actions that are assigned to this Court with this action. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/25/2019. (Baran, Hugh)
February 8, 2019 Filing 72 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #63 MOTION for Attorney(s) Salvatore J. Graziano to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5149290) by Stichting Depositary APG Developed Markets Equity Pool. (Graziano, Salvatore)
February 8, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Salvatore Graziano on behalf of Stichting Depositary APG Developed Markets Equity Pool (Graziano, Salvatore)
February 8, 2019 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #62 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kate W. Aufses to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5149272) by Stichting Depositary APG Developed Markets Equity Pool. (Aufses, Kate)
February 8, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Kate W. Aufses on behalf of Stichting Depositary APG Developed Markets Equity Pool (Aufses, Kate)
February 8, 2019 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #61 MOTION for Attorney(s) Adam H. Wierzbowski to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5149230) by Stichting Depositary APG Developed Markets Equity Pool. (Wierzbowski, Adam)
February 8, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam H Wierzbowski on behalf of Stichting Depositary APG Developed Markets Equity Pool (Wierzbowski, Adam)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #63 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Salvatore J. Graziano. Certificate of Good Standing due by 4/8/2019. Signed by Clerk on 2/7/2019. (Fazekas, J.)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #62 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kate W. Aufses. Certificate of Good Standing due by 4/8/2019. Signed by Clerk on 2/7/2019. (Fazekas, J.)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #61 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Adam H. Wierzbowski. Certificate of Good Standing due by 4/8/2019. Signed by Clerk on 2/7/2019. (Fazekas, J.)
February 6, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION for Attorney(s) Salvatore J. Graziano to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5149290) by Stichting Depositary APG Developed Markets Equity Pool. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Narwold, William)
February 6, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION for Attorney(s) Kate W. Aufses to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5149272) by Stichting Depositary APG Developed Markets Equity Pool. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Narwold, William)
February 6, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION for Attorney(s) Adam H. Wierzbowski to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5149230) by Stichting Depositary APG Developed Markets Equity Pool. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Narwold, William)
February 5, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM Motion Hearing 2/11/2019 at 10:00 AM The motion hearing scheduled for February 11, 2019 at 10:00 AM is canceled, per ECF No. 59. (Baran, Hugh)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 RULING AND ORDER granting #39 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff by Stichting Depositary APG Developed Markets Equity Pool; denying as moot #31 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff by KBC Asset Management NV. For the reasons explained in the attached Ruling and Order, the Court GRANTS the motion of Stichting Depositary APG Developed Markets Equity Pool for appointment as Lead Plaintiff, APPROVES its selection of Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP as Lead Counsel for the Class, and DENIES AS MOOT the motion of KBC Asset Management NV for appointment as Lead Plaintiff.The parties' pre-trial deadlines are amended as follows:-The motion hearing scheduled for February 11, 2019 is canceled.-By April 5, 2019, Lead Plaintiff APG shall file an Amended Complaint.-By June 7, 2019, Defendants shall answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint.-If Defendants move to dismiss the Amended Complaint, briefing will proceed as follows: opposition due August 9, 2019; reply due September 27, 2019.Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/5/2019. (Baran, Hugh)
February 4, 2019 Filing 58 Consent STATUS REPORT Re: Adjournment of Lead Plaintiff Hearing Scheduled for February 11, 2019, Given Non-Opposition to #39 Lead Plaintiff Motion, and Entry of Proposed Scheduling Order for Amended Complaint and Briefing of Anticipated Motion to Dismiss by KBC Asset Management NV, Stichting Depositary APG Developed Markets Equity Pool. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Jasinski, Mathew)
January 29, 2019 Filing 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stichting Depositary APG Developed Markets Equity Pool. (Narwold, William)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #53 Motion to Withdraw #33 Motion to Appoint Counsel, and finding as moot #33 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/24/2019. (Baran, Hugh)
January 23, 2019 Filing 55 Memorandum in Support re #39 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff filed by Stichting Depositary APG Developed Markets Equity Pool. (Narwold, William)
January 23, 2019 Filing 54 RESPONSE re #39 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff, #31 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff Notice of Non-Opposition of KBC Asset Management NV to #39 Concerning Its Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel #31 filed by KBC Asset Management NV. (Narwold, William)
January 23, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION to Withdraw #33 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff by Heavy & General Laborers Local 472 & 172 Pension, Annuity and Welfare Funds. (Whitcomb, Jonathan)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #51 Motion to Withdraw #35 Motion to Appoint Counsel, and finding as moot #35 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/17/2019. (Baran, Hugh)
January 16, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION to Withdraw #35 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and to Appoint Lead Plaintiff by Danica Pension, Livsforsikringsaktieselskab. (Springer, George)
January 11, 2019 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #46 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jeroen van Kwawegen to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5108027) by Stichting Depositary APG Developed Markets Equity Pool. (Van Kwawegen, Jeroen)
January 11, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeroen Van Kwawegen on behalf of Stichting Depositary APG Developed Markets Equity Pool (Van Kwawegen, Jeroen)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #46 Motion to Appear Jeroen van Kwawegen to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/9/2019. Signed by Clerk on 1/8/2019. (Perez, J.)
January 7, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Vassar Pinette on behalf of Heavy & General Laborers Local 472 & 172 Pension, Annuity and Welfare Funds (Pinette, Julie)
January 4, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jeroen van Kwawegen to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5108027) by Stichting Depositary APG Developed Markets Equity Pool. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Jeroen van Kwawegen)(Narwold, William)
January 4, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Mathew P. Jasinski on behalf of Stichting Depositary APG Developed Markets Equity Pool (Jasinski, Mathew)
January 4, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Mathew P. Jasinski on behalf of KBC Asset Management NV (Jasinski, Mathew)
January 4, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #39 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff, #35 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and to Appoint Lead Plaintiff, #33 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff, #31 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. (Baran, Hugh)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 Motion to Withdraw; finding as moot #27 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/4/2019. (Baran, Hugh)
January 3, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION to Withdraw #27 MOTION to Appoint Counsel appoint lead plaintiff and approve lead plaintiff's selection of counsel by Jeffrey Gilbert. (Faxon, Joel)
January 3, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany S. Cates on behalf of Jeffrey Gilbert (Cates, Brittany)
January 2, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff by Stichting Depositary APG Developed Markets Equity Pool. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of William H. Narwold, #3 Exhibit A - Certification, #4 Exhibit B - Loss Charts, #5 Exhibit C - Notice, #6 Exhibit D - BLB&G Resume, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Narwold, William)
January 2, 2019 Filing 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Danica Pension, Livsforsikringsaktieselskab identifying Corporate Parent Danske Bank A/S for Danica Pension, Livsforsikringsaktieselskab. (Springer, George)
January 2, 2019 Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT re #36 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #35 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Declaration in Support Signed By George Springer filed by Danica Pension, Livsforsikringsaktieselskab. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Springer, George)
January 2, 2019 Filing 36 Memorandum in Support re #35 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and to Appoint Lead Plaintiff filed by Danica Pension, Livsforsikringsaktieselskab. (Springer, George)
January 2, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and to Appoint Lead Plaintiff by Danica Pension, Livsforsikringsaktieselskab. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Springer, George)
January 2, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by George C. Springer, Jr on behalf of Danica Pension, Livsforsikringsaktieselskab (Springer, George)
January 2, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff by Heavy & General Laborers Local 472 & 172 Pension, Annuity and Welfare Funds. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Jonathan P. Whitcomb, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Text of Proposed Order, #9 Certificate of Service)(Whitcomb, Jonathan)
January 2, 2019 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KBC Asset Management NV identifying Corporate Parent KBC Group NV for KBC Asset Management NV. (Narwold, William)
January 2, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff by KBC Asset Management NV. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of William H. Narwold, #3 Exhibit A - Certification, #4 Exhibit B - Loss Chart, #5 Exhibit C - Notice, #6 Exhibit D - Motley Rice Firm Resume, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Narwold, William)
January 2, 2019 Filing 30 PROPOSED ORDER re #27 MOTION to Appoint Counsel appoint lead plaintiff and approve lead plaintiff's selection of counsel by Jeffrey Gilbert. (Faxon, Joel)
January 2, 2019 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT re #27 MOTION to Appoint Counsel appoint lead plaintiff and approve lead plaintiff's selection of counsel Signed By Joel T. Faxon filed by Jeffrey Gilbert. (Faxon, Joel)
January 2, 2019 Filing 28 Memorandum in Support re #27 MOTION to Appoint Counsel appoint lead plaintiff and approve lead plaintiff's selection of counsel filed by Jeffrey Gilbert. (Faxon, Joel)
January 2, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Appoint Counsel appoint lead plaintiff and approve lead plaintiff's selection of counsel by Jeffrey Gilbert. (Faxon, Joel)
January 2, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Thomas Faxon on behalf of Jeffrey Gilbert (Faxon, Joel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared Gerber on behalf of Brian D Doubles, Margaret M Keane, Synchrony Financial (Gerber, Jared)
December 10, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Kotler on behalf of Brian D Doubles, Margaret M Keane, Synchrony Financial (Kotler, Meredith)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties' pre-trial deadlines are amended as follows:(a) Defendants' time to move to dismiss, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended until after the Court appoints a Lead Plaintiff, approves the selection of Lead Counsel to represent Lead Plaintiff and the Class, and Lead Plaintiff has filed its amended complaint (as provided for below).(b) Within thirty (30) days of the entry of an order appointing Lead Plaintiff and approving selection of Lead Counsel, the parties will meet and confer regarding a schedule for the filing of an amended complaint and a schedule for any responses thereto, and will file a proposed scheduling order for the Court's consideration.(c) All other deadlines established by the Order on Pretrial Deadlines, ECF No. 2, are continued without date.Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/5/2018. (Baran, Hugh)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jared Gerber. Signed by Clerk on 12/5/2018. (Fazekas, J.)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Meredith Kotler. Signed by Clerk on 12/5/2018. (Fazekas, J.)
December 5, 2018 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Synchrony Financial. (Shearin, James)
December 5, 2018 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/19/2019 (Perez, J.)
December 4, 2018 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Complaint #1 Complaint, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines by Retail Wholesale Department Store Union Local 338 Retirement Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Narwold, William)
December 4, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jared Gerber to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5073752) by Brian D Doubles, Margaret M Keane, Synchrony Financial. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Shearin, James)
December 4, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Meredith Kotler to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5073741) by Brian D Doubles, Margaret M Keane, Synchrony Financial. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Shearin, James)
December 4, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by James T. Shearin on behalf of Brian D Doubles, Margaret M Keane, Synchrony Financial (Shearin, James)
November 27, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Mathew P. Jasinski on behalf of Retail Wholesale Department Store Union Local 338 Retirement Fund (Jasinski, Mathew)
November 19, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Scott R. Foglietta to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5040730) by Retail Wholesale Department Store Union Local 338 Retirement Fund. (Foglietta, Scott)
November 19, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Avi Josefson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5040726) by Retail Wholesale Department Store Union Local 338 Retirement Fund. (Josefson, Avi)
November 14, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Foglietta on behalf of Retail Wholesale Department Store Union Local 338 Retirement Fund (Foglietta, Scott)
November 14, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Avi Josefson on behalf of Retail Wholesale Department Store Union Local 338 Retirement Fund (Josefson, Avi)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Scott R. Foglietta. Certificate of Good Standing due by 1/7/2019. Signed by Clerk on 11/8/2018. (Fazekas, J.)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Avi Josefson. Certificate of Good Standing due by 1/7/2019. Signed by Clerk on 11/8/2018. (Fazekas, J.)
November 7, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Scott R. Foglietta to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5040730) by Retail Wholesale Department Store Union Local 338 Retirement Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Narwold, William)
November 7, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Avi Josefson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5040726) by Retail Wholesale Department Store Union Local 338 Retirement Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Narwold, William)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Brian D Doubles, Margaret M Keane, Synchrony Financial* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *William H. Narwold* *Motley Rice LLC* *One Corporate Ctr., 17th Fl., 20 Church St.* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Fazekas, J.)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Retail Wholesale Department Store Union Local 338 Retirement Fund, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 11/5/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
November 5, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Brian D Doubles, Margaret M Keane, Synchrony Financial. (Narwold, William)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/2/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/2/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/1/2019. Discovery due by 5/4/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 6/8/2019. Signed by Clerk on 11/2/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
November 2, 2018 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Anastasio, F.)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brian M Doubles, Margaret M Keane, Synchrony Financial ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5034885.), filed by Retail Wholesale Department Store Union Local 338 Retirement Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Narwold, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Retail Wholesale Department Store Union Local 338 Retirement Fund v. Synchrony Financial et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Retail Wholesale Department Store Union Local 338 Retirement Fund
Represented By: William H. Narwold
Represented By: Mathew P. Jasinski
Represented By: Avi Josefson
Represented By: Scott Foglietta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stichting Depositary APG Fixed Income Credits Pool
Represented By: Salvatore Graziano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stichting Depositary APG Developed Markets Equity Pool
Represented By: William H. Narwold
Represented By: Mathew P. Jasinski
Represented By: Kate W. Aufses
Represented By: Salvatore Graziano
Represented By: Jeroen Van Kwawegen
Represented By: Adam H Wierzbowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian M Doubles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Financial
Represented By: Meredith Kotler
Represented By: Jared Gerber
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret M Keane
Represented By: Meredith Kotler
Represented By: Jared Gerber
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian D Doubles
Represented By: Meredith Kotler
Represented By: Jared Gerber
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paget Alves
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Coviello, Jr.
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Naylor
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurel Richie
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Michael Q English
Represented By: Evan I. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Represented By: Michael Q English
Represented By: Evan I. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castleoak Securities, L.P.
Represented By: Michael Q English
Represented By: Evan I. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olympia Snowe
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Guthrie
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Seelaus & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Michael Q English
Represented By: Evan I. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Hartnack
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Melito
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Represented By: Meredith Kotler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas M. Quindlen
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Represented By: Meredith Kotler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Represented By: Michael Q English
Represented By: Evan I. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blaylock Van, LLC
Represented By: Michael Q English
Represented By: Evan I. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Williams Capital Group, L.P.
Represented By: Michael Q English
Represented By: Evan I. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mischler Financial Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Q English
Represented By: Evan I. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mizuho Securities USA LLC
Represented By: Michael Q English
Represented By: Evan I. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Graylin
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Arthur W Coviello, Jr.
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Represented By: Meredith Kotler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Laurel J Richie
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Represented By: Meredith Kotler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: William W Graylin
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Represented By: Meredith Kotler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Paget L Alves
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Represented By: Meredith Kotler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Richard C Hartnack
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Represented By: Meredith Kotler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Jeffrey G Naylor
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Represented By: Meredith Kotler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Olympia J. Snowe
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Represented By: Meredith Kotler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Roy A. Guthrie
Represented By: James T. Shearin
Represented By: Meredith Kotler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Danica Pension, Livsforsikringsaktieselskab
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Heavy & General Laborers Local 472 & 172 Pension, Annuity and Welfare Funds
Represented By: Julie Vassar Pinette
Represented By: Jonathan P. Whitcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KBC Asset Management NV
Represented By: William H. Narwold
Represented By: Mathew P. Jasinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jeffrey Gilbert
Represented By: Eric P. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Maureen Aldridge
Represented By: Eric P. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?