Laeger v. Laeger et al
Plaintiff: Pamela Laeger
Defendant: Brian Laeger, 10 Griffin Park North, LLC and Jonathan Laeger
Case Number: 3:2018cv01830
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Shafer, J.)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying as moot #16 Motion for Prejudgment Remedy in light of the Court's 11/27/2018 Order Dismissing Case, Dkt. #20 . Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/27/2018. (Bryan, Kelsey)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying as moot #2 Motion for Prejudgment Remedy in light of the Court's 11/27/2018 Order Dismissing Case, Dkt. #20 . Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/27/2018. (Bryan, Kelsey)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: For the reasons explained in the attached Order, this Court lacks subject matter over this case and it is therefore dismissed. The clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/27/2018. (Bryan, Kelsey)
November 21, 2018 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *10 Griffin Park North, LLC, Brian Laeger* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Maria K. Tougas* *Jacobs, Walker, Rice & Barry, LLC* *146 Main St.* *Manchester, CT 06042*. (Velez, F.)
November 20, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to 10 Griffin Park North, LLC, Brian Laeger. (Tougas, Maria)
November 19, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pamela Laeger. All Defendants. (Tougas, Maria)
November 16, 2018 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER re #16 Amended MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy Garnishment by Pamela Laeger. (Tougas, Maria)
November 16, 2018 Filing 16 Amended MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy Garnishment by Pamela Laeger. (Tougas, Maria)
November 16, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO 13 Order to Show Cause,, by Pamela Laeger filed by Pamela Laeger. (Tougas, Maria)
November 16, 2018 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Verified) against 10 Griffin Park North, LLC, Brian Laeger, filed by Pamela Laeger.(Tougas, Maria)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE on or before 11/27/2018 why this Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this matter when the Complaint #1 asserts diversity jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332 but there is not complete diversity between Plaintiff and all Defendants as required. See Lincoln Property Co. v. Roche, 546 U.S. 81, 82 (2005). The 11/20/2018 Show Cause Hearing related to Plaintiff's Motion for Prejudgment Remedy is canceled pending the resolution of the present issue. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/13/2018. (Bryan, Kelsey)
November 8, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Show Cause Hearing set for 11/20/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. (Shafer, J.)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: Plaintiff's #2 Application for Prejudgment Remedy Garnishment. Defendants Jonathan Laeger, Brian Laeger, 10 Griffin Park North, LLC, c/o/ Agent for Service, Kelly & Trevenen, LLC, and Garnishee Defendants, 370 Danbury Road, LLC, 150 Fisher, LLC, and 10 Griffin Park North, LLC, are hereby ORDERED to appear before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/20/2018 at 9:30am and show cause why the relief requested in Plaintiff's #2 Application for Prejudgment Remedy should not be granted. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/8/2018. (Mattessich, William)
November 8, 2018 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *10 Griffin Park North, LLC, Brian Laeger, Jonathan Laeger* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Maria K. Tougas* *Jacobs, Walker, Rice & Barry, LLC* *146 Main St.* *Manchester, CT 06042*. (Velez, F.)
November 8, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #8 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #4 Proposed Order filed by Pamela Laeger, #1 Complaint filed by Pamela Laeger, #2 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy Garnishment filed by Pamela Laeger, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Protective Order, #6 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 11/8/2018. (Velez, F.)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/7/2018. (Velez, F.)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/7/2018. (Velez, F.)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/7/2018.(Velez, F.) Modified to correct filed date on 11/9/2018 (Shafer, J.).
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/6/2019; Discovery due by 5/9/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 6/13/2019. Signed by Clerk on 11/7/2018. (Velez, F.)
November 7, 2018 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Anastasio, F.)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Pamela Laeger. Document 3 corrected. (Walker, J.)
November 7, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Tougas, Maria)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 ENTERED IN ERROR. Proposed MOTION Order to Show Cause by Pamela Laeger. (Tougas, Maria) Modified on 11/7/2018 (Walker, J.).
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy Garnishment by Pamela Laeger. (Tougas, Maria)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5040150.), filed by Pamela Laeger.(Tougas, Maria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laeger v. Laeger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Laeger
Represented By: Maria K. Tougas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Laeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 10 Griffin Park North, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Laeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?