Savine v. Interactive Brokers, LLC
Petitioner: Antoine Savine
Respondent: Interactive Brokers, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01846
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Reset Deadline as to #2 MOTION to Vacate with Memorandum in Support of Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award. Response due by 1/25/2019 (Gould, K.)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #2 MOTION to Vacate with Memorandum in Support of Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award Responses due by 1/25/2019. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 12/14/2018. (Grossfeld, Eric)
December 14, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Petition To Vacate as to #2 MOTION to Vacate with Memorandum in Support of Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award until January 25, 2019 by Interactive Brokers, LLC. (Goldberg, Thomas)
December 14, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas D. Goldberg on behalf of Interactive Brokers, LLC (Goldberg, Thomas)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Vivian Rivera Drohan. Signed by Clerk on 12/7/2018. (Fazekas, J.)
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Vivian Rivera Drohan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5077237) by Antoine Savine. (Gallagher, Terence)
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Antoine Savine. Interactive Brokers, LLC served on 12/4/2018, answer due 12/25/2018. (Gallagher, Terence)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Interactive Brokers, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Terence J. Gallagher, III.* *Nemchek & Poeschl, LLC* *60 Long Ridge Road, Suite 202* *Stamford, CT 06902*. (Gould, K.)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Protective Order, #1 Complaint,, filed by Antoine Savine, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 MOTION to Vacate with Memorandum in Support of Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award filed by Antoine Savine, #4 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 11/13/2018.(Gould, K.)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 11/09/2018.(Gould, K.)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 11/09/2018.(Gould, K.)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/8/2019 Discovery due by 5/11/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 6/15/2019 Signed by Clerk on 11/09/2018.(Gould, K.)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Vacate with Memorandum in Support of Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award by Antoine Savine. (Gallagher, Terence)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Interactive Brokers, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number BCTDC-5044074.), filed by Antoine Savine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10a, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14)(Gallagher, Terence)
November 9, 2018 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Hushin, Z.)
November 9, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Interactive Brokers, LLC. (Gallagher, Terence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Savine v. Interactive Brokers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Interactive Brokers, LLC
Represented By: Thomas D. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antoine Savine
Represented By: Terence J. Gallagher, III.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?