Guthrie v. General Electric Company et al
Plaintiff: Lecil Guthrie
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC, Elliott Company, General Electric Company, Crane Co. and CBS Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv01868
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 20 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (D'Agostino, Michael)
December 7, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by General Electric Company.(Mohan, Catherine)
December 5, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE by General Electric Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Joinder in Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Summons and Complaint))(Sheldon, Tara)
December 5, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Anne Sheldon on behalf of General Electric Company (Sheldon, Tara)
December 5, 2018 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Mohan, Catherine)
December 5, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A. Mohan on behalf of General Electric Company (Mohan, Catherine)
November 21, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) (With Affirmative Defenses) by Elliott Company.(D'Agostino, Michael)
November 20, 2018 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Gamco Investors, Inc. for CBS Corporation. (Martin, Robert)
November 20, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F. Martin on behalf of CBS Corporation (Martin, Robert)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam for Settlement Purposes. So Ordered by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 11/15/2018.(Pipech, L.)
November 15, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Elliott Company, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Elliott Company, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Notice (Other) filed by Elliott Company, #9 Standing Protective Order, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Elliott Company, 5 Order Referring Case to PJO, #2 Exhibit filed by Elliott Company, #8 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 11/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Murphy, Tatihana)
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by Elliott Company re #1 Notice of Removal, of No Pending Motions (D'Agostino, Michael)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to PJO James Hawkins for Discovery. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 11/15/2018. (Rickevicius, L.)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 11/14/2018.(Murphy, Tatihana)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 11/15/2018.(Murphy, Tatihana)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/13/2019. Discovery due by 5/16/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 6/20/2019. Signed by Clerk on 11/14/2018.(Murphy, Tatihana)
November 14, 2018 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Oliver, T.)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Elliott Company identifying Corporate Parent Ebara Corporation, Other Affiliate Elliott Group Holdings, Inc. for Elliott Company. (D'Agostino, Michael)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Wasil on behalf of Elliott Company (Wasil, Christopher)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 EXHIBIT Civil Action Cover Sheet by Elliott Company re #1 Notice of Removal,. (D'Agostino, Michael)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Elliott Company from New London Superior Court, case number KNL-CV-18-6037687-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5049280, filed by Elliott Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Notice of Removal)(D'Agostino, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guthrie v. General Electric Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company
Represented By: Christopher M. Wasil
Represented By: Michael C. D'Agostino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Tara Anne Sheldon
Represented By: Catherine A. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Robert F. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lecil Guthrie
Represented By: Melissa M. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?