Rigrodsky & Long, P.A et al v. Crystal Rock Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lachtman Cohen P.C., Rigrodsky & Long, P.A and RM Law, P.C.
Defendant: Crystal Rock Holdings, Inc., CR Merger Sub, Inc., Cott Corporation and Crystal Rock Holdings, Inc,
Case Number: 3:2018cv01897
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Bozek, M.)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER dismissing the case in light of the #13 notice of voluntary dismissal. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 12/14/18. (Hall, Gregory)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER finding as moot #11 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 12/14/18. (Hall, Gregory)
December 11, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Cohen, Brian)
November 27, 2018 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by CR Merger Sub, Inc., Cott Corporation, Crystal Rock Holdings, Inc,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Schedule 14D-9), #2 Exhibit 2 (Supplemental Disclosures), #3 Exhibit 3 (Redline of 14D-9 Showing Supplemental Disclosures))(Shope, John)
November 27, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by CR Merger Sub, Inc., Cott Corporation, Crystal Rock Holdings, Inc,.Responses due by 12/18/2018 (Shope, John)
November 21, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CR Merger Sub, Inc., Cott Corporation. (Salmon-Smith, Tracey)
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey Salmon-Smith on behalf of CR Merger Sub, Inc., Cott Corporation with certificate of service (Salmon-Smith, Tracey)
November 21, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Notice of Appearance filed by Cott Corporation, CR Merger Sub, Inc., #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Cott Corporation, CR Merger Sub, Inc., Crystal Rock Holdings, Inc,, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Cott Corporation, CR Merger Sub, Inc., Crystal Rock Holdings, Inc,, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Crystal Rock Holdings, Inc,, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, and #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Crystal Rock Holdings, Inc, Signed by Clerk on 11/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal Standing Order)(Bozek, M.)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey Salmon-Smith on behalf of CR Merger Sub, Inc., Cott Corporation (Salmon-Smith, Tracey)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 11/20/2018.(Bozek, M.)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/19/2019. Discovery due by 5/22/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 6/26/2019. Signed by Clerk on 11/20/2018.(Bozek, M.)
November 20, 2018 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Walker, A)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by CR Merger Sub, Inc., Cott Corporation, Crystal Rock Holdings, Inc. of No Pending Motions (Shope, John)
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crystal Rock Holdings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cott Corporation, Other Affiliate CR Merger Sub, Inc. for Crystal Rock Holdings, Inc.. (Shope, John)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John Andrew Shope on behalf of Crystal Rock Holdings, Inc. (Shope, John)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Crystal Rock Holdings, Inc., CR Merger Sub, Inc., Cott Corporation from Connecticut Superior Court, case number UWY-CV18-6044174-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5057928, filed by Crystal Rock Holdings, Inc., CR Merger Sub, Inc., Cott Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Connecticut Superior Court Docket)(Shope, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rigrodsky & Long, P.A et al v. Crystal Rock Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Rock Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: John Andrew Shope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CR Merger Sub, Inc.
Represented By: John Andrew Shope
Represented By: Tracey Salmon-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cott Corporation
Represented By: Tracey Salmon-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Rock Holdings, Inc,
Represented By: John Andrew Shope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lachtman Cohen P.C.
Represented By: Brian Scott Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rigrodsky & Long, P.A
Represented By: Brian Scott Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RM Law, P.C.
Represented By: Brian Scott Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?