Rizvi et al v. Allstate Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Nusrat Rizvi and Eileen Rizvi
Defendant: A.E. Oberhause, Inc., Allstate Corporation, Dallas C. Dodge, Sr. and A. E. Oberhaus, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01921
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Allstate Corporation (Notice of Correspondence Received From Plaintiffs) (Butts, Josiah)
January 23, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Allstate Corporation to 2/25/2019. (Perez, J.)
January 22, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond T. Demeo on behalf of Allstate Corporation (Demeo, Raymond)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 First MOTION for Extension of Time until February 25, 2019 to Answer or Otherwise Responsively Plead to Complaint by Allstate Corporation. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 01/22/19. (Ryan, Sarah)
January 18, 2019 Filing 16 First MOTION for Extension of Time until February 25, 2019 to Answer or Otherwise Responsively Plead to Complaint by Allstate Corporation. (Butts, Josiah)
January 18, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Josiah T.D. Butts on behalf of Allstate Corporation (Butts, Josiah)
January 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by A. E. Oberhaus, Inc., Dallas C. Dodge, Sr NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULE 12(a) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Antonellis, Anthony)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #12 Motion to Transfer/Disqualify/Recuse Judge. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 01/10/19. (Ryan, Sarah)
January 2, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Disqualify Judge by Nusrat Rizvi. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Perez, J.)
December 20, 2018 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/1/2019 (Perez, J.)
December 19, 2018 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by A. E. Oberhaus, Inc., Dallas C. Dodge, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Antonellis, Anthony)
December 19, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by A. E. Oberhaus, Inc., Dallas C. Dodge, Sr.Responses due by 1/9/2019 (Antonellis, Anthony)
December 19, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by A. E. Oberhaus, Inc.. (Antonellis, Anthony)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J Antonellis on behalf of A. E. Oberhaus, Inc., Dallas C. Dodge, Sr (Antonellis, Anthony)
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Antonellis on behalf of A. E. Oberhaus, Inc., Dallas C. Dodge, Sr (Antonellis, Michael)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *A.E. Oberhause, Inc., Allstate Corporation, Dallas C. Dodge, Sr* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Nusrat Rizvi* *1 Rowayton Court* *Norwalk, CT 06853* (Fazekas, J.)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Nusrat Rizvi, #4 Standing Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, Signed by Clerk on 11/28/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/27/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/27/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/26/2019. Discovery due by 5/29/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/3/2019. Signed by Clerk on 11/27/2018.(Fazekas, J.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2018: #1 REPLACEMENT PDF) (Fazekas, J.).
November 27, 2018 Filing fee received from Nusrat Rizvi: $400.00, receipt number CTXB00009734. (Fazekas, J.)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A.E. Oberhaus, Inc., Allstate Corporation, Dallas C. Dodge, Sr, filed by Nusrat Rizvi.(Fazekas, J.) Modified on 12/19/2018 to edit text(Fazekas, J.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rizvi et al v. Allstate Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.E. Oberhause, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Corporation
Represented By: Raymond T. Demeo
Represented By: Josiah T.D. Butts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas C. Dodge, Sr.
Represented By: Michael S. Antonellis
Represented By: Anthony J Antonellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. E. Oberhaus, Inc.
Represented By: Michael S. Antonellis
Represented By: Anthony J Antonellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nusrat Rizvi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Rizvi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?