Bragin v. Jackson National Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Judith Bragin
Defendant: Jackson National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv01931
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 26 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Judith Bragin. (Moody, Austin)
January 25, 2019 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jackson National Life Insurance Company, filed by Judith Bragin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy, #2 Exhibit Grace Period Notice)(Moody, Austin)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Amend/Correct. Granted absent objection. Plaintiff is directed to docket the amended complaint. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/25/2019. (Lewis, D)
January 22, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint with Consent by Judith Bragin.Responses due by 2/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Red-lined Amended Complaint, #3 Memorandum in Support)(Moody, Austin)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/1/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2019 Status Report due by 4/8/2019 Trial Brief due by 10/1/2019 Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/8/2019.(Lewis, D)
January 3, 2019 Filing 21 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Moody, Austin)
December 28, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Paul Del Mauro on behalf of Jackson National Life Insurance Company Notice of Appearance (Del Mauro, Steven)
December 27, 2018 Filing 19 Second AFFIDAVIT Signed By Steven P. Del Mauro filed by Jackson National Life Insurance Company. (Zarella, Peter)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Certificate of Good Standing due by 2/24/2019. Signed by Clerk on 12/26/2018. (Lewis, D)
December 18, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Steven P. Del Mauro to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5090572) by Jackson National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of S. Del Mauro, #2 Exhibit B - Cert of Good Standing)(Zarella, Peter)
December 3, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Affirmative Defenses by Jackson National Life Insurance Company.(Zarella, Peter)
November 30, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/15/2019 (DeRubeis, B.)
November 30, 2018 Filing 14 Docket Entry Correction: added Standing Order on Removals to #10 Electronic Service Documents. (Barry, Donna)
November 29, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Theresa A. Guertin on behalf of Judith Bragin (Guertin, Theresa)
November 29, 2018 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Judith Bragin. (Moody, Austin)
November 29, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin Moody on behalf of Judith Bragin (Moody, Austin)
November 29, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Notice (Other) filed by Jackson National Life Insurance Company, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Jackson National Life Insurance Company, #9 Order, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Jackson National Life Insurance Company, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Jackson National Life Insurance Company, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Jackson National Life Insurance Company, #8 Protective Order, #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Jackson National Life Insurance Company Signed by Clerk on 11/29/18.(Barry, Donna) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/30/2018: #1 Standing Order on Removals) (Barry, Donna).
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/28/18.(Barry, Donna)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/28/2019 Discovery due by 5/31/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 7/5/2019 Signed by Clerk on 11/28/18.(Barry, Donna)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/28/18.(Barry, Donna)
November 28, 2018 Filing 9 STANDING ORDER re: Discovery. Signed by Clerk on 11/28/18.(Barry, Donna)
November 28, 2018 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Oliver, T.)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jackson National Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Plc. for Jackson National Life Insurance Company. (Zarella, Peter)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Jackson National Life Insurance Company to Counsel re: Local Rule 5(b) (Zarella, Peter)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Jackson National Life Insurance Company of Pending Motions (Zarella, Peter)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Jackson National Life Insurance Company - Statement in Support of Notice of Removal (Zarella, Peter)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J Zarella on behalf of Jackson National Life Insurance Company (Zarella, Peter)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jackson National Life Insurance Company from Connecticut Superior Court, case number FST-CV18-6038752-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5065936, filed by Jackson National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Zarella, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bragin v. Jackson National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Peter J Zarella
Represented By: Steven Paul Del Mauro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Bragin
Represented By: Austin Moody
Represented By: Theresa A. Guertin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?