Robbins et al v. CBS Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Barlow and Wayne Robbins
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC, CBS Corporation and General Electric Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv01974
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Amend/Correct #15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Christopher Collings to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5081177) by CBS Corporation.Responses due by 2/19/2019 (Martin, Robert)
December 13, 2018 Docket Entry Correction re Corporate Disclosure Statement (ECF No. #14 ): modified to include affiliated companies National Amusements, Inc. and NAI Entertainment Holdings LLC. (Ferguson, L.)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Notice of Joinder of Defendant CBS Corporation in Removal of Action Filed by General Electric Co. Under 28 U.S.C. 1442 (ECF No. #13 ) is hereby APPROVED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 12/13/2018. (Patel, R.)
December 11, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Christopher Collings to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5081177) by CBS Corporation. (Martin, Robert)
December 11, 2018 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Gamco Investors, Inc. and other affiliated companies National Amusements, Inc and NAI Entertainment Holdings LLC for CBS Corporation. (Martin, Robert) Modified on 12/13/2018 to include affiliated companies (Ferguson, L.).
December 11, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Joinder re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by General Electric Company by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Martin, Robert)
December 11, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F. Martin on behalf of CBS Corporation (Martin, Robert)
December 10, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by General Electric Company.(Mohan, Catherine)
December 6, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #9 Protective Order, #4 Notice (Other) filed by General Electric Company, #3 Notice (Other) filed by General Electric Company, #6 Notice of Appearance filed by General Electric Company, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by General Electric Company, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by General Electric Company, #5 Notice of Appearance filed by General Electric Company, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, and #8 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 12/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal Standing Order)(Bozek, M.)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 12/4/2018.(Bozek, M.)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 12/4/2018.(Bozek, M.)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/2/2019. Discovery due by 6/5/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/10/2019. Signed by Clerk on 12/4/2018.(Bozek, M.)
December 4, 2018 Judge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Anastasio, F.)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Anne Sheldon on behalf of General Electric Company (Sheldon, Tara)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A. Mohan on behalf of General Electric Company (Mohan, Catherine)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by General Electric Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice Pursuant to Standing Order on Removed Cases (Mohan, Catherine)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by General Electric Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Pending Motions (Mohan, Catherine)
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Mohan, Catherine)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by General Electric Company from Superior Court Judicial District of Fairfield at Bridgeport, case number AB-FBT-CV18-6080354-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5073692, filed by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (served summons & complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Court Record), #3 Exhibit C (Notice to State Court))(Mohan, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robbins et al v. CBS Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Robert F. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Tara Anne Sheldon
Represented By: Catherine A. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Barlow
Represented By: Brian P. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Robbins
Represented By: Brian P. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?