Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest v. Salerno
Plaintiff: Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Defendant: Kathleen Salerno
Case Number: 3:2018cv01980
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Warren W Eginton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Imbriani, Susan)
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Gostyla, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael John Reilly on behalf of Kathleen Salerno (Reilly, Michael)
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Kathleen Salerno* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jeffrey F. Gostyla* *Halloran & Sage* *One Goodwin Sq., 225 Asylum St.* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Fazekas, J.)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 12/6/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 12/5/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 12/5/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/3/2019. Discovery due by 6/6/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/11/2019. Signed by Clerk on 12/5/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
December 5, 2018 Judge Warren W. Eginton added. (Oliver, T.)
December 5, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Gostyla, Jeffrey)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kathleen Salerno ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5075492.), filed by Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gostyla, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest v. Salerno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Salerno
Represented By: Michael John Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Represented By: Jeffrey F. Gostyla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?