Main Street America Assurance Company et al v. J. D'Amelia & Associates, L.L.C. et al

Plaintiff: Main Street America Assurance Company and NGM Insurance Company
Defendant: Keith Pemberton and J. D'Amelia & Associates, L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01989
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: Connecticut District Court
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Donn A. Swift on behalf of J. D'Amelia & Associates, L.L.C. (Swift, Donn)
January 22, 2019 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Keith Pemberton waiver sent on 1/7/2019, answer due 3/8/2019 filed by Main Street America Assurance Company; NGM Insurance Company. (Ober, Scott)
January 10, 2019 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *J. D'Amelia & Associates, L.L.C.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Scott T. Ober* *Hassett & Donnelly, P.C.-MA* *446 Main St., 12th Floor* *Worcester, MA 01608*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
January 7, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to J. D'Amelia & Associates, L.L.C.. (Ober, Scott)
December 6, 2018 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Main Street America Assurance Company, #7 Standing Protective Order, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by NGM Insurance Company, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by NGM Insurance Company, Main Street America Assurance Company, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by NGM Insurance Company, Main Street America Assurance Company Signed by Clerk on 12/6/2018.(Murphy, Tatihana)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/6/2018.(Murphy, Tatihana)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/6/2018.(Murphy, Tatihana)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/4/2019. Discovery due by 6/7/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/12/2019. Signed by Clerk on 12/6/2018.(Murphy, Tatihana)
December 6, 2018 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Oliver, T.)
December 6, 2018 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NGM Insurance Company. (Ober, Scott)
December 6, 2018 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Main Street America Assurance Company. (Ober, Scott)
December 6, 2018 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly E. Petter on behalf of Main Street America Assurance Company, NGM Insurance Company (Petter, Kelly)
December 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5076384.), filed by Main Street America Assurance Company, NGM Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ober, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Main Street America Assurance Company et al v. J. D'Amelia & Associates, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Main Street America Assurance Company
Represented By: Scott T. Ober
Represented By: Kelly E. Petter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NGM Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott T. Ober
Represented By: Kelly E. Petter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Pemberton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. D'Amelia & Associates, L.L.C.
Represented By: Donn A. Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?