National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA v. Performance Transportation & Logistics LLC et al

Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Defendant: BH 92 Trucking Inc. and Performance Transportation & Logistics LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01995
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1337
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by BH 92 Trucking Inc..(Wildes, James)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Approved. So ORDERED re #14 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 1/31/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
January 31, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Performance Transportation & Logistics LLC Without Prejudice by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Lovejoy, Frederick)
January 31, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lovejoy, Frederick)
December 21, 2018 Answer deadline updated for BH 92 Trucking Inc. to 2/1/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 2/1/2019 to respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/21/2018. (Rickevicius, L.)
December 20, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until 02/01/2019 To Plead #1 Complaint, by BH 92 Trucking Inc.. (Wildes, James)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James E. Wildes on behalf of BH 92 Trucking Inc. (Wildes, James)
December 7, 2018 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Performance Transportation & Logistics LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Frederick A. Lovejoy* *Lovejoy & Associates* *276 Center Road* *Easton, CT 06612*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
December 7, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *BH 92 Trucking Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Frederick A. Lovejoy* *Lovejoy & Associates* *276 Center Road* *Easton, CT 06612*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint, filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA Signed by Clerk on 12/7/2018.(Murphy, Tatihana)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/6/2018.(Murphy, Tatihana)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/6/2018.(Murphy, Tatihana)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/4/2019. Discovery due by 6/7/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/12/2019. Signed by Clerk on 12/6/2018.(Murphy, Tatihana)
December 6, 2018 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Oliver, T.)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick A. Lovejoy on behalf of National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA (Lovejoy, Frederick)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA. (Lovejoy, Frederick)
December 6, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Performance Transportation & Logistics LLC. (Lovejoy, Frederick)
December 6, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to BH 92 Trucking Inc.. (Lovejoy, Frederick)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Performance Transportation& Logistics LLC and BH 92 Trucking Inc. against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5076557.), filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA.(Lovejoy, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA v. Performance Transportation & Logistics LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Frederick A. Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BH 92 Trucking Inc.
Represented By: James E. Wildes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Performance Transportation & Logistics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?