Jeffreys v. Waterbury
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Jeffreys
Defendant: Town of Waterbury
Case Number: 3:2018cv02009
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 USM 285 forms together with Summons Complaint, OPTD, Order granting IFP reviewed and sent to USM for service on defendant. (Pesta, J.)
December 13, 2018 Filing 9 USM 285 forms together with Summons and all instructions mailed to IFP plaintiff to complete and return to Clerk's office. (Fanelle, N.)
December 13, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Thomas J. Jeffreys, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Thomas J. Jeffreys, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order, 6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #5 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 12/13/2018. (Fanelle, N.)
December 13, 2018 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Town of Waterbury* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Thomas J. Jeffreys* *511 Cooke Street* *Waterbury, CT 06710*. (Fanelle, N.)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/12/2018. (Gutierrez, Y.)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/10/2018.(Fanelle, N.)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/10/2018. (Fanelle, N.)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/8/2019 Discovery due by 6/11/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 7/16/2019 Signed by Clerk on 12/11/2018. (Fanelle, N.)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thomas J. Jeffreys. (Fanelle, N.)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Town of Waterbury, filed by Thomas J. Jeffreys. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Fanelle, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeffreys v. Waterbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Jeffreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Waterbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?