State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Young et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: Joyceson Young and Sandra Manager
Case Number: 3:2018cv02053
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Scott Williams on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Williams, Henry)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward M. Rosenthal on behalf of Joyceson Young (Rosenthal, Edward)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Sandra Manager served on 12/22/2018, answer due 1/12/2019. (Scapellati, Daniel)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Joyceson Young served on 12/26/2018, answer due 1/16/2019. (Scapellati, Daniel)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Sandra Manager, Joyceson Young* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel P. Scapellati* *Halloran & Sage* *One Goodwin Sq., 225 Asylum St.* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Bozek, M.)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, Request to Issue Summons, and #3 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 12/17/2018.(Bozek, M.)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 12/13/2018.(Bozek, M.)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/11/2019. Discovery due by 6/14/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/19/2019. Signed by Clerk on 12/13/2018.(Bozek, M.)
December 13, 2018 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Anastasio, F.)
December 13, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Joyceson Young. (Scapellati, Daniel)
December 13, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Sandra Manager. (Scapellati, Daniel)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sandra Manager, Joyceson Young ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5085623.), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Notice, #2 Exhibit A, #3 B)(Scapellati, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Young et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Daniel P. Scapellati
Represented By: Henry Scott Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyceson Young
Represented By: Edward M. Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Manager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?