Higgins et al v. CBS Corp et al
Plaintiff: Barry Higgins and Brenda Higgins
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company, CBS Corp and Crane Co.
Cross Defendant: CBS Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv02075
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Warren W Eginton
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Docket Entry Correction re #23 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim: modified to change Crossclaim against all Plaintiffs to Crossclaim against all Defendants. (Imbriani, Susan)
January 16, 2019 Filing 23 Defendant Crane Co.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Crane Co..(Lyons, Thomas) Modified on 1/18/2019 (Imbriani, Susan).
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 1/9/19. (Ladd-Smith, I.)
January 7, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Oswald on behalf of Foster Wheeler LLC (Oswald, James)
January 7, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Joinder re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by General Electric Company by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Souza, Kristen)
January 7, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Foster Wheeler LLC.(Souza, Kristen)
January 3, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Co.. (Lyons, Thomas)
January 3, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foster Wheeler LLC identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group plc (Scotland) for Foster Wheeler LLC. (Souza, Kristen)
January 2, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen R. Souza on behalf of Foster Wheeler LLC (Souza, Kristen)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 12/27/18. (Ladd-Smith, I.)
December 26, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas N. Lyons on behalf of Crane Co. (Lyons, Thomas)
December 21, 2018 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corp identifying Corporate Parent Gamco Investors, Inc. for CBS Corp. (Martin, Robert)
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Joinder re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by General Electric Company by CBS Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Martin, Robert)
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F. Martin on behalf of CBS Corp (Martin, Robert)
December 19, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Notice Pursuant to Standing Order filed by General Electric Company, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by General Electric Company, #9 Standing Protective Order, #3 Notice of Pending Motions filed by General Electric Company, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by General Electric Company, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Notice of Appearance filed by Catherine A. Mohan on behalf of General Electric Company, #8 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Notice of Appearance filed by Tara Anne Sheldon on behalf of General Electric Company Signed by Clerk on 12/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 12/18/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 12/18/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/16/2019. Discovery due by 6/19/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/24/2019. Signed by Clerk on 12/18/2018.(Fazekas, J.)
December 18, 2018 Judge Warren W. Eginton added. (Oliver, T.)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Anne Sheldon on behalf of General Electric Company (Sheldon, Tara)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A. Mohan on behalf of General Electric Company (Mohan, Catherine)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by General Electric Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice Pursuant to Standing Order (Mohan, Catherine)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by General Electric Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Pending Motions (Mohan, Catherine)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Mohan, Catherine)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by General Electric Company from Superior Court Judicial District of Fairfield at Bridgeport, case number FBT-cv-18-6080927-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5090604, filed by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Mohan, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Higgins et al v. CBS Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: Kristen R. Souza
Represented By: James R. Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Tara Anne Sheldon
Represented By: Catherine A. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corp
Represented By: Robert F. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Thomas N. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Higgins
Represented By: Christopher Meisenkothen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Higgins
Represented By: Christopher Meisenkothen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?