USA v. 2015 Cadillac ATS Coupe, VIN 1G6AJ1RX2F0136679 et al

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: 2013 Toyota 4Runner SR5 Limited Trail, VIN JTEBU5JR4D5145750, 2005 Toyota Tacoma Extended Cab X-Runner, VIN 5TETU22N65Z096018 and 2015 Cadillac ATS Coupe, VIN 1G6AJ1RX2F0136679
Claimant: Carlos Delgado
Case Number: 3:2018cv02078
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Referring Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Janet C. Hall for all further proceedings. All filings in this matter should be filed with the Clerk's office in New Haven and bear the docket number 3:18-cv-2078-JCH. So ordered by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/21/2018.(Pipech, L.)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by USA, #2 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 12/20/2018.(Murphy, Tatihana)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/19/2018.(Murphy, Tatihana)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/19/2018.(Murphy, Tatihana)
December 19, 2018 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Oliver, T.)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 2005 Toyota Tacoma Extended Cab X-Runner, VIN 5TETU22N65Z096018, 2013 Toyota 4Runner SR5 Limited Trail, VIN JTEBU5JR4D5145750, 2015 Cadillac ATS Coupe, VIN 1G6AJ1RX2F0136679, filed by USA.(Sullivan, David) Modified on 12/19/2018 to correct parties (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. 2015 Cadillac ATS Coupe, VIN 1G6AJ1RX2F0136679 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2013 Toyota 4Runner SR5 Limited Trail, VIN JTEBU5JR4D5145750
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2005 Toyota Tacoma Extended Cab X-Runner, VIN 5TETU22N65Z096018
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2015 Cadillac ATS Coupe, VIN 1G6AJ1RX2F0136679
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Carlos Delgado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: John B. Hughes
Represented By: David X. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?