Mirlis v. Greer

Plaintiff: Eliyahu Mirlis
Defendant: Sarah Greer
Case Number: 3:2018cv02082
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
0 Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
1 Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 16 OBJECTION re #13 MOTION to Seal Answer filed by Eliyahu Mirlis. (Cesaroni, John)
January 16, 2019 Filing 15 Sealed Document: unredacted answer by Sarah Greer . (Margolis, Stuart)
January 16, 2019 Filing 14 Redacted ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Sarah Greer.(Margolis, Stuart)
January 16, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Seal Answer by Sarah Greer. (Margolis, Stuart)
January 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart A. Margolis on behalf of Sarah Greer (Margolis, Stuart)
January 8, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eliyahu Mirlis. Sarah Greer served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. (Cesaroni, John)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew K. Beatman on behalf of Eliyahu Mirlis (Beatman, Matthew)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Michael P. Shea for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/21/2018.(Gutierrez, Y.)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Sarah Greer* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John Louis Cesaroni* *Zeisler & Zeisler, P.C.* *10 Middle Street 15th Floor* *Bridgeport, CT 06604*. (Barry, Donna)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Standing Protective Order, #2 MOTION to Seal Complaint filed by Eliyahu Mirlis, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Eliyahu Mirlis, #3 Sealed Document filed by Eliyahu Mirlis. Signed by Clerk on 12/20/18.(Barry, Donna)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/19/18.(Barry, Donna)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/19/18.(Barry, Donna)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/17/2019, Discovery due by 6/20/2019 and Dispositive Motions due by 7/25/2019. Signed by Clerk on 12/19/18.(Barry, Donna)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 Sealed Document: Complaint by Eliyahu Mirlis re #2 MOTION to Seal Complaint . (Cesaroni, John)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Complaint by Eliyahu Mirlis. (Cesaroni, John)
December 19, 2018 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Oliver, T.)
December 19, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Sarah Greer. (Cesaroni, John)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sarah Greer ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5092350.), filed by Eliyahu Mirlis.(Cesaroni, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mirlis v. Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliyahu Mirlis
Represented By: John Louis Cesaroni
Represented By: Matthew K. Beatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Greer
Represented By: Stuart A. Margolis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?