Adams v. Vigilant Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Eleanor Jean Adams
Defendant: Vigilant Insurance Company and Great Northern Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv02092
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 12/1/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 12/31/2019; Joint Trial Memorandu due by 12/31/2019; Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/30/2019 at 3:30 PM in Chambers Room 208, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer. (Gutierrez, Y.)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 GENERAL SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties' Rule 26(f) Planning Report (Doc. #14 ) is hereby APPROVED as modified by this order. All discovery shall be completed by December 1, 2019, and all other interim discovery dates set forth in the parties' Rule 26(f) Report are hereby adopted. A telephonic status conference will be held on August 30, 2019 at 3:30pm. Plaintiff shall initiate call. Once all parties are on the line, please call chambers at (203) 773-2105. Any dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by 30 days after the close of discovery on December 31, 2019, and any response to dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed within 30 days by January 30, 2020. The parties' joint trial memorandum is due by 30 days after the close of discovery on December 31, 2019, or within 30 days of the Court's ruling on dispositive summary judgment motions, whichever date is later. The Court will thereafter set a trial date, and the parties should be prepared to proceed to jury selection within 30 days of the filing of the joint trial memorandum. Please refer to Judge Meyer's webpage on the District of Connecticut website for Judge Meyer's "Instructions for Discovery Disputes" and "Instructions for Joint Trial Memorandum" and "Pretrial Preferences" and "Trial Preferences." The parties are encouraged to commence discovery forthwith and to arrange their schedules in contemplation of the briefing deadlines for any dispositive motions, because the Court is unlikely to grant a future request for an extension of the scheduling order absent extraordinary and unforeseeable circumstances. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 2/7/2019. (Sokoloff-Rubin, E.)
February 6, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bloss, William)
February 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew G. Conway on behalf of Great Northern Insurance Company (Conway, Matthew)
January 24, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Vigilant Insurance Company to 2/18/2019. (Pesta, J.)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 MOTION for Extension of Time until February 18, 2019 to Reply #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/24/19. (Pesta, J.)
January 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until February 18, 2019 to Reply #1 Complaint by Vigilant Insurance Company. (Conway, Matthew)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court DENIES without prejudice the motion for extension of time (Doc. #9) for failure to "include a statement of the movant that (1) the movant has inquired of all non-moving parties and there is agreement or objection to the motion, or that (2) despite diligent effort, including making the inquiry in sufficient time to afford non-movant a reasonable opportunity to respond, the movant cannot ascertain the position(s) of the non-movant(s)." D. Conn. L. Civ. R.7(b) (2). Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 01/18/19. (Barry, Donna)
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until February 18, 2019 to Reply #1 Complaint by Vigilant Insurance Company. (Conway, Matthew)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew G. Conway on behalf of Vigilant Insurance Company (Conway, Matthew)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eleanor Jean Adams. All Defendants. (Bloss, William)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Great Northern Insurance Company, Vigilant Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *William M. Bloss* *Koskoff, Koskoff & Bieder, P.C.* *350 Fairfield Ave.* *Bridgeport, CT 06604*. (Barry, Donna)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Eleanor Jean Adams, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 12/20/18.(Barry, Donna)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/20/18.(Barry, Donna)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/20/18.(Barry, Donna)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/18/2019, Discovery due by 6/21/2019 and Dispositive Motions due by 7/26/2019. Signed by Clerk on 12/20/18.(Barry, Donna)
December 20, 2018 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Oliver, T.)
December 20, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Bloss, William)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5093738.), filed by Eleanor Jean Adams.(Bloss, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Vigilant Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleanor Jean Adams
Represented By: William M. Bloss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vigilant Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew G. Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Northern Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew G. Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?