Haddad et al v. Zimmer Inc et al
Plaintiff: Louis Haddad, Louis Haddad, Jr. and Debra Haddad
Defendant: Zimmer Holdings, Inc. and Zimmer Inc
Case Number: 3:2018cv02102
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Acknowledgment of Receipt re: Case Transferred Out - Case transferred from Connecticut has been opened in Southern District of New York as case 1:19-cv-00900, filed 01/30/2019. (Oliver, T.)
January 24, 2019 Case electronically transferred to the Southern District of New York. (Oliver, T.)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 MDL Transfer Order. Case transferred to Southern District of New York. (signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the MDL Panel on 1/22/19.) (Barry, Donna)
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Zimmer Inc waiver sent on 1/4/2019, answer due 3/5/2019 filed by Debra Haddad; Louis Haddad, Jr. (Cates, Brittany)
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Zimmer Holdings, Inc. waiver sent on 1/4/2019, answer due 3/5/2019 filed by Debra Haddad; Louis Haddad, Jr. (Cates, Brittany)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany S. Cates on behalf of Debra Haddad, Louis Haddad, Jr (Cates, Brittany)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Inc* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joel Thomas Faxon* *Faxon Law Group, LLC* *59 Elm St.* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Pesta, J.)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Louis Haddad Signed by Clerk on 12/21/18.(Pesta, J.)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/21/18.(Pesta, J.)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/21/18.(Pesta, J.)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/19/2019 Discovery due by 6/22/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 7/27/2019 Signed by Clerk on 12/21/18.(Pesta, J.)
December 21, 2018 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Walker, A)
December 21, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Zimmer Holdings, Inc. n/k/a Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Inc.. (Faxon, Joel)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zimmer Holdings, Inc. n/k/a Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5096366.), filed by Louis Haddad.(Faxon, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haddad et al v. Zimmer Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Haddad
Represented By: Joel Thomas Faxon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Haddad, Jr.
Represented By: Joel Thomas Faxon
Represented By: Brittany S. Cates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Haddad
Represented By: Joel Thomas Faxon
Represented By: Brittany S. Cates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?