Lavatec Laundry Technology GmbH v. Maxi-Press Elastomeric, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lavatec Laundry Technology GmbH
Defendant: Voss Laundry Solutions, Inc., Hector Alejandro, Wieap Beheer B.V., Reiner Schmelcher, Maxi-Press Elastomeric, Inc., Finlog SA and Voss Laundry Solutions Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv02108
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Hector Alejandro to 3/1/2019; Maxi-Press Elastomeric, Inc. to 3/1/2019; Reiner Schmelcher to 3/1/2019. (Freberg, B)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting, absent objection, #15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 1, 2019 to Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/13/2019. (Freberg, B)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Moritz C. Schumann to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/29/2019. Signed by Clerk on 1/28/2019. (Reis, Julia)
January 25, 2019 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 1, 2019 to Respond to the Complaint #1 Complaint by Hector Alejandro, Maxi-Press Elastomeric, Inc., Reiner Schmelcher. (Carberry, John)
January 25, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Moritz C. Schumann to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5134602) by Hector Alejandro, Maxi-Press Elastomeric, Inc., Reiner Schmelcher. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ex. A)(Carberry, John)
January 25, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Maxi-Press Elastomeric, Inc.. (Carberry, John)
January 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Carberry on behalf of Hector Alejandro, Maxi-Press Elastomeric, Inc., Reiner Schmelcher (Carberry, John)
January 11, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lavatec Laundry Technology GmbH. Hector Alejandro served on 1/10/2019, answer due 1/31/2019; Maxi-Press Elastomeric, Inc. served on 1/10/2019, answer due 1/31/2019; Reiner Schmelcher served on 1/10/2019, answer due 1/31/2019. (Shufrin, David)
January 9, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lavatec Laundry Technology GmbH. Voss Laundry Solutions Inc. served on 12/31/2018, answer due 1/21/2019. (Shufrin, David)
December 27, 2018 Filing 9 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Reis, Julia)
December 27, 2018 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Hector Alejandro, Finlog SA, Maxi-Press Elastomeric, Inc., Reiner Schmelcher, Voss Laundry Solutions Inc., Wieap Beheer B.V.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David C. Shufrin and David A. Slossberg* *Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff LLC* *147 North Broad St.* *Milford, CT 06460-0112*. (Reis, Julia)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Lavatec Laundry Technology GmbH, #6 Protective Order, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Lavatec Laundry Technology GmbH, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Lavatec Laundry Technology GmbH Signed by Clerk on 12/27/2018.(Reis, Julia)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Shufrin on behalf of Lavatec Laundry Technology GmbH (Shufrin, David)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 12/21/2018.(Reis, Julia)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 12/21/2018.(Reis, Julia)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/19/2019 Discovery due by 6/22/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 7/27/2019 Signed by Clerk on 12/21/2018.(Reis, Julia)
December 21, 2018 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Anastasio, F.)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lavatec Laundry Technology GmbH. (Slossberg, David)
December 21, 2018 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Slossberg, David)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5097181.), filed by Lavatec Laundry Technology GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Slossberg, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lavatec Laundry Technology GmbH v. Maxi-Press Elastomeric, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voss Laundry Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Alejandro
Represented By: John F. Carberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wieap Beheer B.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reiner Schmelcher
Represented By: John F. Carberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maxi-Press Elastomeric, Inc.
Represented By: John F. Carberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Finlog SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Voss Laundry Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavatec Laundry Technology GmbH
Represented By: David A. Slossberg
Represented By: David C. Shufrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?