Community Association Underwriters of America v. Von Oehsen
Plaintiff: Community Association Underwriters of America
Defendant: Katherine Von Oehsen
Case Number: 3:2019cv00016
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 First SUMMONS Returned Executed by Community Association Underwriters of America. Katherine Von Oehsen served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019., First CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Community Association Underwriters of America (Donnelly, Derek)
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Community Association Underwriters of America as to Katherine Von Oehsen. (Donnelly, Derek)
January 31, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Katherine Von Oehsen. (Donnelly, Derek)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Katherine Von Oehsen* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Derek E. Donnelly* *Law Office of Stuart G. Blackburn* *2 Concorde Way #3C, P.O. Box 608* *Windsor Locks, CT 06096*. (Barry, Donna)
January 9, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Katherine Von Oehsen. (Donnelly, Derek)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Community Association Underwriters of America, #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 01/07/19. (Barry, Donna)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 01/04/19. (Barry, Donna)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 01/04/19. (Barry, Donna)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/5/2019, Discovery due by 7/6/2019 and Dispositive Motions due by 8/10/2019. Signed by Clerk on 01/04/19. (Barry, Donna)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Katherine Von Oehsen ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5107012.), filed by Community Association Underwriters of America.(Donnelly, Derek)
January 4, 2019 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Anastasio, F.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Community Association Underwriters of America v. Von Oehsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Von Oehsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Community Association Underwriters of America
Represented By: Derek E. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?