USA v. $11,650.00 in United States Currency

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $11,650.00 in United States Currency
Claimant: Dylan Daniel McCarthy
Case Number: 3:2019cv00044
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 WARRANT of Arrest in Rem Returned Executed on 1/16/2019 as to $11,650.00 in United States Currency (Reis, Julia)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 WARRANT of Arrest In Rem Issued (Reis, Julia)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by USA, #4 Standing Protective Order, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by USA. Signed by Clerk on 01/10/19. (Barry, Donna)
January 10, 2019 Docket Entry Correction re #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Entry entered in error. (Barry, Donna)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David X. Sullivan on behalf of USA (Sullivan, David)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 01/09/19. (Barry, Donna)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 01/09/19. (Barry, Donna)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 ENTERED IN ERROR: Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/10/2019, Discovery due by 7/11/2019 and Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2019. Signed by Clerk on 01/09/19. (Barry, Donna) Modified on 1/10/2019 (Barry, Donna).
January 9, 2019 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Oliver, T.)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $11,650.00 in United States Currency, filed by USA.(Hughes, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $11,650.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dylan Daniel McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $11,650.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: John B. Hughes
Represented By: David X. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?