Rochdale Securities, LLC v. Entwistle & Cappucci, LLP et al

Plaintiff: Rochdale Securities, LLC
Defendant: Entwistle & Cappucci, LLP and Vincent R. Cappucci
Case Number: 3:2019cv00048
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Warren W Eginton
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 2/14/2019. (LaMura, K.)
February 13, 2019 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Meet and Confer Pursuant to D.Conn.L.Civ.R 26(f) by Rochdale Securities, LLC. (Moriarty, James)
January 30, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court Reply in Further Support of its January 23, 2019, Motion for Remand filed by Rochdale Securities, LLC. (Moriarty, James)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 1/30/2019. (LaMura, K.)
January 29, 2019 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Rochdale Securities, LLC. (Moriarty, James)
January 29, 2019 Filing 16 Memorandum in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Vincent R. Cappucci, Entwistle & Cappucci, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Entity Search Status Details, #2 Exhibit B - Information provided by the CT Div. of Corporations website)(Shrewsberry, Lisa)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 1/24/2019. (LaMura, K.)
January 23, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Rochdale Securities, LLC.Responses due by 2/13/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Moriarty, James)
January 23, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vincent R. Cappucci, Entwistle & Cappucci, LLP re #11 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, #12 Affidavit,,,, (Shrewsberry, Lisa)
January 22, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Signed By Lisa L. Shrewsberry filed by Vincent R. Cappucci, Entwistle & Cappucci, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - SEC Order dated 10.28.15, #3 Exhibit C - FINRA Broker Check Report pertaining to Daniel Crowley, #4 Exhibit D - Entity Search Status Details provided by the Delaware Dept. of State website on 1.8.19, #5 Exhibit E - Entity Search Status Details Provided by the CT Div. of Corporations on 1.8.19, #6 Exhibit F - Email exchange between Hal Tunick and James Kaplan on 10.25.12, #7 Exhibit G - Retainer Agreement between the parties, #8 Exhibit H - Contract between Rochdale Securities, LLC and Morgan Stanley dated 5.8.09, #9 Exhibit I - Email exchange between Rochdale Securities, LLC and Aaron A. Romney dated 7.9.13, #10 Exhibit J - Letter from Jed Horowitt to Andrew Entwistle dated 8.22.16, #11 Exhibit K - Consecutive Tolling Agreements between the parties, #12 Exhibit L - SEC Order dated 12.10.14 pertaining to Morgan Stanley)(Shrewsberry, Lisa)
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Vincent R. Cappucci, Entwistle & Cappucci, LLP. (Shrewsberry, Lisa)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Vincent R. Cappucci, Entwistle & Cappucci, LLP.Responses due by 2/12/2019 (Shrewsberry, Lisa)
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time until February 1, 2019 to Respond, Including Filing a Motion to Dismiss, to Plaintiff's Complaint by Vincent R. Cappucci, Entwistle & Cappucci, LLP. (Shrewsberry, Lisa)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Moriarty on behalf of Rochdale Securities, LLC (Moriarty, James)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Vincent R. Cappucci, Entwistle & Cappucci, LLP (Shrewsberry, Lisa)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ***ENTERED IN ERROR - DUPLICATE*** STANDING ORDER ON REMOVED CASES. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 1/10/19.(Imbriani, Susan) Modified on 1/11/2019 (Imbriani, Susan).
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Vincent R. Cappucci, Entwistle & Cappucci, LLP, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 1/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 1/10/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 1/10/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/11/2019. Discovery due by 7/12/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 8/16/2019. Signed by Clerk on 1/10/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
January 10, 2019 Judge Warren W. Eginton added. (Anastasio, F.)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Vincent R. Cappucci, Entwistle & Cappucci, LLP from Superior Court J.D. of Fairfield at Bridgeport, case number FBT-CV-19-6082251S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5114544, filed by Vincent R. Cappucci, Entwistle & Cappucci, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint)(Shrewsberry, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rochdale Securities, LLC v. Entwistle & Cappucci, LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entwistle & Cappucci, LLP
Represented By: Lisa L. Shrewsberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent R. Cappucci
Represented By: Lisa L. Shrewsberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochdale Securities, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Romney
Represented By: James M. Moriarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?