Precision Trenchless, LLC v. Saertex multiCom LP et al
Plaintiff: Precision Trenchless, LLC
Defendant: Saertex multiCom LP and Granite Inliner, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00054
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Warren W Eginton
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Steven R. Kramer to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5164698) by Granite Inliner, LLC. (Kramer, Steven)
February 27, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Granite Inliner, LLC. (Burke, Michael)
February 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven R. Kramer on behalf of Granite Inliner, LLC (Kramer, Steven)
February 25, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Saertex multiCom LP to 3/27/2019. (LaMura, K.)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 2/25/2019. (LaMura, K.)
February 21, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time until March 27, 2019 to Plead by Saertex multiCom LP. (Lynch, Michael)
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Lynch on behalf of Saertex multiCom LP (Lynch, Michael)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Steven R. Kramer. Certificate of Good Standing due by 4/22/2019. Signed by Clerk on 2/21/19. (Imbriani, Susan)
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Steven R. Kramer to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5164698) by Granite Inliner, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A to Petition for Admission)(Burke, Michael)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Granite Inliner, LLC.(Burke, Michael)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Proof of Service, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Notice to Counsel and Pro Se Parties, Standing Protective Order, Electronic Filing Order and Order on Pretrial Deadlines served on Saertex Multicom, LP, Granite Inliner, LLC on 1/28/2019, filed by Precision Trenchless, LLC. (Baldwin, Andrew)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Granite Inliner, LLC, Saertex multiCom LP* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Andrew L. Baldwin* *Goldberg Segalla LLP - CT* *100 Pearl Street, Suite 1100* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Reis, Julia)
January 14, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Baldwin, Andrew)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Precision Trenchless, LLC, #3 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 1/11/19.(Imbriani, Susan)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 1/11/19.(Imbriani, Susan)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 1/11/19.(Imbriani, Susan)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/12/2019; Discovery due by 7/13/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 8/17/2019. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 1/11/19.(Imbriani, Susan)
January 10, 2019 Judge Warren W. Eginton added. (Anastasio, F.)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5116118.), filed by Precision Trenchless, LLC.(Baldwin, Andrew) Modified on 1/11/2019 to correct filed against parties (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Precision Trenchless, LLC v. Saertex multiCom LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saertex multiCom LP
Represented By: Michael S. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite Inliner, LLC
Represented By: Steven R. Kramer
Represented By: Michael J. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Precision Trenchless, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Laurence Milrad
Represented By: Andrew L Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?