Pizzuti v. Penachio et al

Plaintiff: Michele Pizzuti and Michael Pizzuti
Defendant: Anne J. Penachio and Penachio Malara, LLP
Case Number: 3:2019cv00059
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Anne J. Penachio, Penachio Malara, LLP* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Michele Pizzuti #51089-054* *Danbury Federal Correctional Institution* *Route 37* *Danbury, CT 06811*. (Bozek, M.)
January 31, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Anne J. Penachio, Penachio Malara, LLP. (Bozek, M.)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Michele Pizzuti, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 1/14/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 1/11/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/12/2019. Discovery due by 7/13/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 8/17/2019. Signed by Clerk on 1/11/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
January 11, 2019 Filing fee received from Michelle Pizzuti: $400.00, receipt number CTXB00009850. (Fazekas, J.)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anne J. Penachio, Penachio Malara, LLP, filed by Michele Pizzuti. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pizzuti v. Penachio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne J. Penachio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penachio Malara, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Pizzuti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Pizzuti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?