Morgan v. Pratt & Whitney
Plaintiff: Dushan Morgan
Defendant: Pratt & Whitney
Case Number: 3:2019cv00063
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2612
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/14/2019, at 4:00PM, before Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam. This case has been referred to Judge Merriam for a settlement conference. She will hold a pre-conference telephone call with counsel on 3/14/2019, at 4:00PM. A firm date for the settlement conference will be set during that telephone call. The Court requires all named parties and any other persons necessary to achieve full settlement (such as insurance representatives) to attend the settlement conference in person. Therefore, counsel must consult with their clients and other necessary parties prior to the telephone call to determine any dates on which they will be unavailable in the next 120 days. Counsel should also have their own calendars available to facilitate scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference for the conference to be productive. Please use the following dial-in for this call: (888)278-0296; Access Code: 2280867. (Katz, S.)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: Discovery due by 7/15/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 8/19/2019 Status Report due by 6/4/2019 Trial Brief due by 8/19/2019 Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/4/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam for settlement conference SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/1/2019.(Lewis, D)
February 28, 2019 Filing 17 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Dushan Morgan. (Cicchiello, Emanuele)
February 28, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Emanuele Robert Cicchiello on behalf of Dushan Morgan (Cicchiello, Emanuele)
February 26, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Carpentier, Jacqueline)
February 26, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael John Reilly on behalf of Dushan Morgan (Reilly, Michael)
January 17, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/26/2019 (Lewis, D)
January 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 1/14/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
January 14, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #9 Electronic Filing Order, #11 Order, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Pratt & Whitney, #7 Answer to Complaint filed by Pratt & Whitney, #6 Notice (Other) filed by Pratt & Whitney, #10 Protective Order, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Pratt & Whitney, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Pratt & Whitney, #8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Pratt & Whitney, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Pratt & Whitney Signed by Clerk on 1/14/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/11/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/11/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/11/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/12/2019 Discovery due by 7/13/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 8/17/2019 Signed by Clerk on 1/11/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Pratt & Whitney.(Carpentier, Jacqueline)
January 11, 2019 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Oliver, T.)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Pratt & Whitney of Pending Motions (Carpentier, Jacqueline)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Pratt & Whitney of Compliance with the Court's Standing Order on Removed Cases (Carpentier, Jacqueline)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pratt & Whitney identifying Corporate Parent United Technologies Corporation for Pratt & Whitney. (Carpentier, Jacqueline)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline G. Carpentier on behalf of Pratt & Whitney, A Division of United Technologies Corporation (Carpentier, Jacqueline)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony S. Califano on behalf of Pratt & Whitney, A Division of United Technologies Corporation (Califano, Anthony)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pratt & Whitney, A Division of United Technologies Corporation from Hartford Superior Court, case number HHD-CV19-6105022-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5117681, filed by Pratt & Whitney, A Division of United Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice)(Carpentier, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan v. Pratt & Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pratt & Whitney
Represented By: Jacqueline G. Carpentier
Represented By: Anthony S. Califano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dushan Morgan
Represented By: Emanuele Robert Cicchiello
Represented By: Michael John Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?