Haidon v. Bloomfield et al
Plaintiff: Lauren Haidon
Defendant: Zachary Klomberg, Matthew Suplee, Brendan Danaher, Other Known or Unknown Officers of the Bloomfield Police Department, Paul Hammick and Town of Bloomfield
Case Number: 3:2019cv00119
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristan M. Maccini on behalf of Town of Bloomfield, Brendan Danaher, Paul Hammick, Zachary Klomberg, Other Known or Unknown Officers of the Bloomfield Police Department, Matthew Suplee (Maccini, Kristan)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Marco Cercone to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5137688) by Lauren Haidon. (Cercone, Marco)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Marco Cercone on behalf of Lauren Haidon (Cercone, Marco)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Attorney Marco Cercone to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/31/2019. Signed by Clerk on 1/30/2019. (Oliver, T.)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Marco Cercone to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5137688) by Lauren Haidon. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Marco Cercone)(Lehberger, Benjamin)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Town of Bloomfield, Brendan Danaher, Paul Hammick, Zachary Klomberg, Matthew Suplee* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Benjamin J. Lehberger* *Dilworth IP, LLC* *2 Corporate Drive, Suite 206* *Trumbull, CT 06611*. (Fazekas, J.)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Lauren Haidon Signed by Clerk on 1/25/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 1/24/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 1/24/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/25/2019. Discovery due by 7/26/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 8/30/2019. Signed by Clerk on 1/24/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5131970.), filed by Lauren Haidon.(Lehberger, Benjamin)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Brendan Danaher, Paul B. Hammick, Zachary Klomberg, Matthew Suplee, Town of Bloomfield. (Lehberger, Benjamin)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Judge Stefan R Underhill added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haidon v. Bloomfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Haidon
Represented By: Benjamin J. Lehberger
Represented By: Marco Cercone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Klomberg
Represented By: Kristan M. Maccini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Suplee
Represented By: Kristan M. Maccini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brendan Danaher
Represented By: Kristan M. Maccini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other Known or Unknown Officers of the Bloomfield Police Department
Represented By: Kristan M. Maccini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Hammick
Represented By: Kristan M. Maccini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Bloomfield
Represented By: Kristan M. Maccini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?