Jersey: Osorio v. Gallo

Plaintiff: Jersey: Osorio
Defendant: Dawn Gallo
Case Number: 3:2019cv00151
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jersey: Osorio. (Fazekas, J.)
March 13, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Dawn Gallo.Responses due by 4/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit)(O'Neill, Terrence)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION / Request for Order to Post Security for Costs by Dawn Gallo.Responses due by 3/26/2019 (O'Neill, Terrence)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Terrence M. O'Neill on behalf of Dawn Gallo , in her Official and Individual Capacity (O'Neill, Terrence)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jersey: Osorio. Dawn Gallo served on 2/19/2019, answer due 3/12/2019. (Fazekas, J.)
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Electronic Summons Issued, #1 Complaint filed by Jersey: Osorio, #4 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 2/1/2019.(Reis, Julia)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Dawn Gallo* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Jersey: Osorio* *86 Maplewood Ave #3* *Pittsfield, MA 01201*. (Reis, Julia)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/1/2019.(Reis, Julia)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/1/2019.(Reis, Julia)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/2/2019 Discovery due by 8/3/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 9/7/2019 Signed by Clerk on 2/1/2019.(Reis, Julia)
February 1, 2019 Filing fee received from Osorio: $400, receipt number CTXH00015184 (Reis, Julia)
February 1, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Dawn Gallo. (Reis, Julia)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dawn Gallo, filed by Jersey: Osorio. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope 1, #3 Envelope 2, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E)(Reis, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jersey: Osorio v. Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jersey: Osorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Gallo
Represented By: Terrence M. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?