State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Pizzonia et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: Anthony Pizzonia and Leigh Ann Pizzonia
Case Number: 3:2019cv00176
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Rudzik, Keith)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE within seven days of the date of this order why default should not be entered in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a). Plaintiff properly served Defendant Anthony Pizzonia and Defendant's Answer was due 3/1/2019. If Defendant does not comply with this order, the Clerk will enter default. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/5/2019. (Shafer, J.)
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Anthony Pizzonia served on 2/8/2019, answer due 3/1/2019. (Rudzik, Keith)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Anthony Pizzonia* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Keith R. Rudzik* *Howard, Kohn, Sprague & Fitzgerald* *237 Buckingham St., PO Box 261798* *Hartford, CT 06126-1798*. (Velez, F.)
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Protective Order, #2 Exhibit filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, #3 Exhibit filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #1 Complaint filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Signed by Clerk on 2/6/2019. (Velez, F.)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/6/2019. (Velez, F.)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/6/2019. (Velez, F.)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/6/2019. (Velez, F.)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/7/2019; Discovery due by 8/8/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 9/12/2019. Signed by Clerk on 2/6/2019. (Velez, F.)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 EXHIBIT B by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company re #1 Complaint. (Rudzik, Keith)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBIT A by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company re #1 Complaint. (Rudzik, Keith)
February 6, 2019 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Anastasio, F.)
February 6, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Anthony Pizzonia. (Rudzik, Keith)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Other Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5148346.), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Rudzik, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Pizzonia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Keith R. Rudzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Pizzonia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leigh Ann Pizzonia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?