Durham v. Doe et al
Plaintiff: Kareem Jamar Durham
Defendant: Jane Does, John Doe, Durant, Frank, Saas, Tardiff, Tung, John Does, T. Calland, Jane Doe, T. Callands, Susannah Tung, Amanda Hannah, Joyel, Jane & John Does and Denise Walker
Case Number: 3:2019cv00190
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying #20 Motion for Reconsideration. A plaintiff in a civil case is not entitled to appointment of counsel on request and the Second Circuit repeatedly cautions against the routine appointment of counsel. See, e.g., Hendricks v. Coughlin, 114 F.3d 390, 393 (2d Cir. 1997); Cooper v. A. Sargenti Co., 877 F.2d 170, 172 (2d Cir. 1989). Insofar as volunteer lawyer time is not always readily available, a plaintiff seeking appointment of counsel must show first that he sought counsel and has been unable to obtain it. McDonald v. Head Criminal Court Supervisor Officer, 850 F.2d 121, 123 (2d Cir. 1988). Once a plaintiff has made this showing, he must then demonstrate that his complaint passes the test of likely merit. Cooper, 877 F.2d at 173. He must demonstrate that the claims in the complaint have a sufficient basis to justify appointing a volunteer lawyer to pursue them. Notably, even where a claim is not frivolous, counsel is often unwarranted where the [plaintiffs] chances of success are extremely slim. Id. at 171. As previously found, the present state of the record does not allow the Court to conclude that the Plaintiff's claims have "likely merit." The motion is denied anew without prejudice should the facts that develop through the litigation permit reassessment of this issue. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 4/1/19. (Dooley, Kari)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The Court's review of the amended complaint [#11] revealed that it is missing page 7. The clerk's office has confirmed that they never received the missing page. Therefore, the amended complaint [#11] is dismissed without prejudice and the motion to amend [#17] is denied as moot. Within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the plaintiff must file a second amended complaint with all pages intact. The second amended complaint should not be a supplement to the initial complaint [#1]. Rather, it should contain all of the allegations against the defendants, including the allegations contained in the initial complaint and the new officials the plaintiff seeks to add as a defendants. The defendants' deadline to file a responsive pleading is extended until twenty-one (21) days after the plaintiff files his second amended complaint. If the plaintiff does not file a second amended complaint within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the case will proceed on the initial complaint.Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 3/28/19.(Dooley, Kari)
March 26, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Reconsideration re #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Kareem Jamar Durham. (Fanelle, N.)
March 25, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to T. Callands waiver sent on 3/6/2019, answer due 5/5/2019 filed by Kareem Jamar Durham. (Fanelle, N.)
March 25, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Amend #11 Amended Complaint by Kareem Jamar Durham. Responses due by 4/15/2019. (Fanelle, N.) Modified on 3/29/2019 (Gould, K.).
March 22, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Frank waiver sent on 3/6/2019, answer due 5/5/2019 filed by Kareem Jamar Durham. (Fanelle, N.)
March 21, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kareem Jamar Durham (Payton, R.)
March 18, 2019 Filing 14 Summons returned executed as to Frank, Durant, Tardiff, Saas, T. Calland and Tung c/o Attorney General, filed by Kareem Jamar Durham. (Barry, Donna)
March 15, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Susannah Tung waiver sent on 3/6/2019, answer due 5/5/2019. filed by Kareem Jamar Durham. (Fanelle, N.)
March 14, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kareem Jamar Durham (Payton, R.)
March 14, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against T. Callands, Durant, Frank, Saas, Tardiff, Tung, Denise Walker, Amanda Hannah, Joyel, Jane & John Does, filed by Kareem Jamar Durham.(Fanelle, N.)
March 6, 2019 USM 285 forms together with Summons, Complaint, Order granting IFP reviewed and sent to USM for service on defendant(s).Marshals Return of Service on Summons due by 3/26/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *T. Calland, Durant, Frank, Saas, Tardiff, Tung* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Kareem Jamar Durham #378505* *GARNER CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION* *50 Nunnawauk Rd, P.O. Box 5500* *Newtown, CT 06470*. (Fanelle, N.)
March 6, 2019 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Frank, Durant, Tardiff, Saas, T. Calland and Tung on 3/6/2019 by Kareem Jamar Durham. Waiver of Service due by 4/10/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER re: Initial Discovery Disclosures Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 3/6/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER and Order Denying #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. See Attached. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 2/21/19.(Dooley, Kari)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1 (c)2 provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 2/11/2019. (Payton, R.)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRISCS - STANDING ORDER ON PRISONER ELECTRONIC FILING PROGRAM Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 2/7/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRISCS - STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 2/7/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRISCS - ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 2/7/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 PRISCS - MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Kareem Jamar Durham. (Fazekas, J.) Modified on 3/5/2019 to terminate motion (Gould, K.).
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kareem Jamar Durham. (Fazekas, J.)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 PRISCS - COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kareem Jamar Durham.(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Durham v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Durant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tardiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Calland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Callands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susannah Tung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Hannah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane & John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kareem Jamar Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?