Rountree v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Letisha Renee Rountree
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv00194
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: William I Garfinkel
Referring Judge: Sarah A L Merriam
2 Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Fishman on behalf of Nancy Berryhill (Fishman, Emily)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Nancy Berryhill, Letisha Renee Rountree. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William I. Garfinkel. This matter has been transferred to a magistrate judge. All non-efiled submissions should be filed at the seat of court where the magistrate judge presides. The case number will remain the same, but must be followed by the magistrate judge's initials. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 2/25/2019.(Anastasio, F.)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Consent to Magistrate Judge by Letisha Renee Rountree (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Reis, Julia)
February 8, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Nancy Berryhill to 4/9/2019. (Fazekas, J.)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 2/8/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 2/8/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER ON SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 2/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Fazekas, J.)
February 8, 2019 Judge Stefan R Underhill and Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam added. (Anastasio, F.)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5151664.), filed by Letisha Renee Rountree.(Spilka, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rountree v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Represented By: Emily Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Letisha Renee Rountree
Represented By: John P. Spilka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?