Karp v. SI Financial Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Selwyn Karp
Defendant: Rheo A. Brouillard, Kevin M. McCarthy, Roger Engle, Donna M. Evan, Berkshire Hills Bancorp, Inc., Kathleen A. Nealon, Robert C. Cushman, Sr., Robert O. Gillard, Mark D. Alliod, Dennis Pollack, SI Financial Group, Inc. and Michael R. Garvey
Case Number: 3:2019cv00199
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Filing 21 EXHIBIT 1 re: Notice of Filing Distributed Press Release Re: PSLRA Deadline by Selwyn Karp re #20 Notice (Other). (Egleston, Gregory)
March 20, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Selwyn Karp Notice of Filing Distributed Press Release Re: PSLRA Deadline (Egleston, Gregory)
March 18, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Michael Egleston on behalf of Selwyn Karp (Egleston, Gregory)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE. 15 U.S.C. 78u4(3)(A)(i) requires that "[n]ot later than 20 days after the date on which the complaint is filed, the plaintiff or plaintiffs shall cause to be published, in a widely circulated national business-oriented publication or wire service, a notice advising members of the purported plaintiff class--(I) of the pendency of the action, the claims asserted therein, and the purported class period; and (II) that, not later than 60 days after the date on which the notice is published, any member of the purported class may move the court to serve as lead plaintiff of the purported class." The #1 complaint was filed on February 8, 2019, and so plaintiff was required to publish such notice by February 28, 2019. Accordingly, within 7 days of this order, plaintiff shall file on the docket a certification of compliance with this notice requirement. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 3/13/2019. (Barclay, Michael)
February 26, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to SI Financial Group, Inc. waiver sent on 2/22/2019, answer due 4/23/2019 filed by Selwyn Karp. (Riley, James)
February 26, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Roger Engle waiver sent on 2/22/2019, answer due 4/23/2019 filed by Selwyn Karp. (Riley, James)
February 26, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Dennis Pollack waiver sent on 2/22/2019, answer due 4/23/2019 filed by Selwyn Karp. (Riley, James)
February 26, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Kathleen A. Nealon waiver sent on 2/22/2019, answer due 4/23/2019 filed by Selwyn Karp. (Riley, James)
February 26, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Kevin M. McCarthy waiver sent on 2/22/2019, answer due 4/23/2019 filed by Selwyn Karp. (Riley, James)
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Robert O. Gillard waiver sent on 2/22/2019, answer due 4/23/2019 filed by Selwyn Karp. (Riley, James)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Michael R. Garvey waiver sent on 2/22/2019, answer due 4/23/2019 filed by Selwyn Karp. (Riley, James)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Donna M. Evan waiver sent on 2/22/2019, answer due 4/23/2019 filed by Selwyn Karp. (Riley, James)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Robert C. Cushman, Sr waiver sent on 2/22/2019, answer due 4/23/2019 filed by Selwyn Karp. (Riley, James)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Rheo A. Brouillard waiver sent on 2/22/2019, answer due 4/23/2019 filed by Selwyn Karp. (Riley, James)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Mark D. Alliod waiver sent on 2/22/2019, answer due 4/23/2019 filed by Selwyn Karp. (Riley, James)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Mark D. Alliod, Berkshire Hills Bancorp, Inc., Rheo A. Brouillard, Robert C. Cushman, Sr, Roger Engle, Donna M. Evan, Michael R. Garvey, Robert O. Gillard, Kevin M. McCarthy, Kathleen A. Nealon, Dennis Pollack, SI Financial Group, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *James C. Riley* *Whitman, Breed, Abbott & Morgan LLC - CT* *500 W. Putnam Ave.* *Greenwich, CT 06830*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Selwyn Karp, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 02/19/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 02/08/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 02/08/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/9/2019. Discovery due by 8/10/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 9/14/2019. Signed by Clerk on 02/08/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
February 8, 2019 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Oliver, T.)
February 8, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Riley, James)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5153040.), filed by Selwyn Karp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Riley, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karp v. SI Financial Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rheo A. Brouillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin M. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Engle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna M. Evan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Hills Bancorp, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen A. Nealon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert C. Cushman, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert O. Gillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark D. Alliod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SI Financial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Garvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selwyn Karp
Represented By: James C. Riley
Represented By: Gregory Michael Egleston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?