Blue Fin Tankers, Inc. v. Bomin Deutschland GmbH

Plaintiff: BLUE FIN TANKERS, INC.
Defendant: BOMIN DEUTSCHLAND GMBH
Case Number: 3:2019cv00200
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Warren W Eginton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Appointment of Special Process Server. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 4/3/19. (Imbriani, Susan)
April 2, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Appointment of Special Process Server by Blue Fin Tankers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vignocchi, Clayton)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James H. Power and F. Robert Denig. Certificate of Good Standing due by 4/29/2019. Signed by Clerk on 2/28/19.. (Imbriani, Susan)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) James H. Power and F. Robert Denig to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5173124) by Blue Fin Tankers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of James H. Power, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of F. Robert Denig, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Vignocchi, Clayton)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Bomin Deutschland GmbH* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Clayton J. Vignocchi* *Holland & Knight LLP - NY* *31 West 52nd St.* *New York, NY 10019*. (Fazekas, J.)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Heidmar International Pools, Inc., #1 Complaint, filed by Heidmar International Pools, Inc., #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 2/11/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 2/8/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 2/8/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/9/2019. Discovery due by 8/10/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 9/14/2019. Signed by Clerk on 2/8/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
February 8, 2019 Judge Warren W. Eginton added. (Anastasio, F.)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BLUE FIN TANKERS, INC. identifying Other Affiliate Heidmar International Pools, Inc. for BLUE FIN TANKERS, INC.. (Vignocchi, Clayton)
February 8, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to BOMIN DEUTSCHLAND GMBH. (Vignocchi, Clayton)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BOMIN DEUTSCHLAND GMBH ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5153153.), filed by BLUE FIN TANKERS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Confirmation of Order, #2 Exhibit B - Bomins General Conditions, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vignocchi, Clayton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue Fin Tankers, Inc. v. Bomin Deutschland GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLUE FIN TANKERS, INC.
Represented By: Clayton J. Vignocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOMIN DEUTSCHLAND GMBH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?