Gaston v. Acelity Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alison P. Gaston
Defendant: Kinetic Concepts, Inc., Acelity Holdings, Inc., KCI USA and Acelity L.P.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00207
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER:As set forth on the record 3/12/19, the following is ordered: (1) Plaintiffs Amended Complaint will be filed by 4/2/19; (2) Defendants Motion to Dismiss will be filed by 4/16/19; opposition will be filed by 5/7/19; any reply will be filed by 5/21/19; (3) the parties 26(f) Planning Report will be filed five days after ruling; and (4) the parties shall advise the Court if referral for settlement conference would be of assistance.(Tooker, A.)
March 12, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet Bond Arterton: Telephonic Pre-Filing Conference held on 3/12/2019. Total Time: 1 hours and 00 minutes(Court Reporter Tracy Gow.) (Freberg, B)
February 26, 2019 A telephonic pre-filing conference will be held 3/12/19 at 10:30 a.m. Defense counsel shall initiate the conference call to chambers: 203-773-2737. (Tooker, A.)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Pre-Filing Conference. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/26/19. (Tooker, A.)
February 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Pre-Filing Conference to Address the Proposed Motion to Dismiss by Acelity Holdings, Inc., Kinetic Concepts, Inc.. (Smith, Kevin)
February 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Acelity Holdings, Inc., Kinetic Concepts, Inc. of Removal Statement Pursuant to Standing Order on Removed Cases (Smith, Kevin)
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Acelity Holdings, Inc., Kinetic Concepts, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Acelity L.P. Inc. for Acelity Holdings, Inc.; Corporate Parent Chiron Holdings, Inc. for Kinetic Concepts, Inc.. (Smith, Kevin)
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #7 Electronic Filing Order, #8 Protective Order, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Certificate of Service filed by Acelity Holdings, Inc., Kinetic Concepts, Inc., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Acelity Holdings, Inc., Kinetic Concepts, Inc., #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Acelity Holdings, Inc., Kinetic Concepts, Inc., #5 Notice (Other) filed by Acelity Holdings, Inc., Kinetic Concepts, Inc., #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Acelity Holdings, Inc., Kinetic Concepts, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 2/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removals)(Reis, Julia)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/11/2019.(Reis, Julia)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/11/2019.(Reis, Julia)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/12/2019 Discovery due by 8/13/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 9/17/2019 Signed by Clerk on 2/11/2019.(Reis, Julia)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Acelity Holdings, Inc., Kinetic Concepts, Inc. of Pending Motions (Smith, Kevin)
February 11, 2019 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Oliver, T.)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Acelity Holdings, Inc. aka Acelity L.P., Inc., Kinetic Concepts, Inc. aka KCI USA, Inc. of Filing of Notice of Removal of Action (Attachments: #1 Filing of Notice of Removal of Action)(Norman-Schiff, David)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David Jacob Norman-Schiff on behalf of Acelity Holdings, Inc. aka Acelity L.P., Inc., Kinetic Concepts, Inc. aka KCI USA, Inc. (Norman-Schiff, David)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Smith on behalf of Acelity Holdings, Inc. aka Acelity L.P., Inc., Kinetic Concepts, Inc. aka KCI USA, Inc. (Smith, Kevin)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kinetic Concepts, Inc. aka KCI USA, Inc., Acelity Holdings, Inc. aka Acelity L.P., Inc. from Superior Court of State of Connecticut - Ansonia Milford at Milford, case number AAN-CV19-6032005-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5154736, filed by Kinetic Concepts, Inc. aka KCI USA, Inc., Acelity Holdings, Inc. aka Acelity L.P., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Smith, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaston v. Acelity Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinetic Concepts, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin M. Smith
Represented By: David Norman-Schiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acelity Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin M. Smith
Represented By: David Norman-Schiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KCI USA
Represented By: Kevin M. Smith
Represented By: David Norman-Schiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acelity L.P.
Represented By: Kevin M. Smith
Represented By: David Norman-Schiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alison P. Gaston
Represented By: Daniel H. Cotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?