USA v. $2,502.00 in United States Currency

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $2,502.00 in United States Currency
Claimant: Albert Lee Robinson
Case Number: 3:2019cv00222
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Jaiman, R.)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This case has been reported settled. Rather than keeping it open on the docket, the Clerk is directed to administratively close the file without prejudice to reopening within 30 days of this order. If the parties wish to file a stipulation of dismissal (for approval by the court or simply for inclusion in the court's file), they may do so within 30 days of this order. The dates set forth in this order may be extended for good cause pursuant to a motion filed in accordance with Local Rule 7. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 4/10/2019 (Pincus, A).
April 5, 2019 Filing 6 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by USA. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Intent to File Return on Service By Publication and Motion For Order of Forfeiture)(Hughes, John)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 WARRANT of Arrest in REM issued. (Barry, Donna)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by USA Signed by Clerk on 2/15/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 2/14/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 2/14/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
February 14, 2019 Judge Stefan R Underhill added. (Anastasio, F.)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $2,502.00 in United States Currency, filed by USA.(Hughes, John) Modified on 2/14/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $2,502.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $2,502.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: John B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Albert Lee Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?