McHugh v. SI Financial Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert McHugh
Defendant: Rheo Brouillard, Dennis Pollack, Donna Evan, Mark Alliod, Roger Engle, Kevin McCarthy, Robert Gillard, Michael Garvey, SI Financial Group, Inc. and Kathleen Nealon
Case Number: 3:2019cv00236
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Warren W Eginton
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Michael Garvey waiver sent on 2/19/2019, answer due 4/20/2019; Mark Alliod waiver sent on 2/19/2019, answer due 4/20/2019; Rheo Brouillard waiver sent on 2/19/2019, answer due 4/20/2019; Robert Gillard waiver sent on 2/19/2019, answer due 4/20/2019; Kathleen Nealon waiver sent on 2/19/2019, answer due 4/20/2019; SI Financial Group, Inc. waiver sent on 2/19/2019, answer due 4/20/2019; Kevin McCarthy waiver sent on 2/19/2019, answer due 4/20/2019; Roger Engle waiver sent on 2/19/2019, answer due 4/20/2019; Dennis Pollack waiver sent on 2/19/2019, answer due 4/20/2019; Donna Evan waiver sent on 2/19/2019, answer due 4/20/2019 filed by Robert McHugh. (Hopkins, Shannon)
February 20, 2019 Docket Entry Correction re #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Electronic Service Documents; corrected judge. (Imbriani, Susan)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Mark Alliod, Rheo Brouillard, Roger Engle, Donna Evan, Michael Garvey, Robert Gillard, Kevin McCarthy, Kathleen Nealon, Dennis Pollack, SI Financial Group, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Shannon L. Hopkins* *Levi & Korsinsky, LLP* *1111 Summer Street, Suite 403* *Stamford, CT 06905*. (Imbriani, Susan)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Robert McHugh, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 2/15/19.(Imbriani, Susan) Modified on 2/20/2019 (Imbriani, Susan).
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 2/15/19.(Imbriani, Susan) Modified on 2/20/2019 (Imbriani, Susan).
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 2/15/19.(Imbriani, Susan) Modified on 2/20/2019 (Imbriani, Susan).
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/20/2019; Discovery due by 8/21/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 9/25/2019. Signed by Clerk on 2/15/19.(Imbriani, Susan) Modified on 2/20/2019 (Imbriani, Susan).
February 15, 2019 Judge Warren W. Eginton added. (Anastasio, F.)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5161267.), filed by Robert McHugh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hopkins, Shannon)
February 15, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Hopkins, Shannon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McHugh v. SI Financial Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rheo Brouillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Evan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Alliod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Engle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Gillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Garvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SI Financial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Nealon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert McHugh
Represented By: Shannon L. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?