State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Campbell et al

Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: Mercedes Alvarado and Julie Campbell
Case Number: 3:2019cv00254
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Mercedes Alvarado waiver sent on 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019 filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Rudzik, Keith)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Julie Campbell waiver sent on 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019 filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Rudzik, Keith)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint, filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company Signed by Clerk on 2/21/2019.(Reis, Julia)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/20/2019.(Reis, Julia)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/20/2019.(Reis, Julia)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/21/2019 Discovery due by 8/22/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 9/26/2019 Signed by Clerk on 2/20/2019.(Reis, Julia)
February 20, 2019 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Anastasio, F.)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for declaratory and other relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5165382.), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint in Underlying Action)(Rudzik, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Campbell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Keith R. Rudzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes Alvarado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?