Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Tracks Cafe, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Wacissa River Music, Inc., MJ Publishing Trust, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Coral Reefer Music, Welsh Witch Music, Tokeco Tunes, Melody Lane Publications, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc. and MJ Publishing Trust doing business as MIJAC Music
Defendant: Tracks Cafe, LLC, Jed Simon, OG Social Club and Tracks Cafe, LLC doing business as Old Greenwich Social Club also known as OG Social Club
Case Number: 3:2019cv00259
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by Jed Simon, Tracks Cafe, LLC.(Walko, Stephen)
March 20, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Jed Simon to 3/28/2019. (Johnson, D.)
March 20, 2019 Filing 15 Defendant Simon's #14 consented motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint is GRANTED. Defendant Simon's response to the complaint is due March 28, 2019.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 3/20/2019. (Barclay, Michael)
March 19, 2019 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 03/28/2019 file a responsive pleading #1 Complaint, by Jed Simon, Tracks Cafe, LLC. (Walko, Stephen)
March 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen George Walko on behalf of Jed Simon, Tracks Cafe, LLC (Walko, Stephen)
March 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Christine Sisca on behalf of Jed Simon, Tracks Cafe, LLC (Sisca, Andrea)
March 18, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Welsh Witch Music, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Wacissa River Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Tokeco Tunes, Broadcast Music, Inc., Coral Reefer Music, Melody Lane Publications, Inc., MJ Publishing Trust. Tracks Cafe, LLC served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019. (Rye, Michael)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Welsh Witch Music, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Wacissa River Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Tokeco Tunes, Broadcast Music, Inc., Coral Reefer Music, Melody Lane Publications, Inc., MJ Publishing Trust. Jed Simon served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Rye, Michael)
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc., Coral Reefer Music, MJ Publishing Trust, Melody Lane Publications, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Tokeco Tunes, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Wacissa River Music, Inc., Welsh Witch Music identifying Corporate Parent TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc., Coral Reefer Music, MJ Publishing Trust, Melody Lane Publications, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Tokeco Tunes, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Wacissa River Music, Inc., Welsh Witch Music. (Rye, Michael)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Attachment) (Murphy, Tatihana)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Jed Simon* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael J. Rye* *Cantor Colburn LLP - Htfd* *20 Church Street, 22nd Floor* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Tracks Cafe, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael J. Rye* *Cantor Colburn LLP - Htfd* *20 Church Street, 22nd Floor* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Songs of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Coral Reefer Music, Melody Lane Publications, Inc., Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., MJ Publishing Trust, Welsh Witch Music, Wacissa River Music, Inc., Tokeco Tunes, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 02/22/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 02/21/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 02/21/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/22/2019. Discovery due by 8/23/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 9/27/2019. Signed by Clerk on 02/21/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
February 21, 2019 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Oliver, T.)
February 21, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Tracks Cafe, LLC. (Rye, Michael)
February 21, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Jed Simon. (Rye, Michael)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jed Simon, Tracks Cafe, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5166981.), filed by Welsh Witch Music, Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Wacissa River Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Tokeco Tunes, Broadcast Music, Inc., Coral Reefer Music, Melody Lane Publications, Inc., MJ Publishing Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Song Schedule)(Rye, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Tracks Cafe, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracks Cafe, LLC
Represented By: Stephen George Walko
Represented By: Andrea Christine Sisca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jed Simon
Represented By: Stephen George Walko
Represented By: Andrea Christine Sisca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OG Social Club
Represented By: Stephen George Walko
Represented By: Andrea Christine Sisca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracks Cafe, LLC doing business as Old Greenwich Social Club also known as OG Social Club
Represented By: Stephen George Walko
Represented By: Andrea Christine Sisca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wacissa River Music, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MJ Publishing Trust
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal - Songs of Polygram International, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coral Reefer Music
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Welsh Witch Music
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tokeco Tunes
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melody Lane Publications, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MJ Publishing Trust doing business as MIJAC Music
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?