Moore-Callands v. Danbury

Plaintiff: Marlene Moore-Callands
Defendant: City Of Danbury
Case Number: 3:2019cv00312
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 10, 2019 to file a response to Plaintif's Complaint by City Of Danbury. (Zelman, Johanna)
April 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna M Goldman on behalf of City Of Danbury (Goldman, Jenna)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: discovery due by 11/27/2019; dispositive motions due by 12/25/2019; trial brief due by 1/22/2020; trial ready date 2/19/2020. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 4/15/19. (Covello, Alfred)
April 11, 2019 Filing 9 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Van Katwyk, Danielle)
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Van Katwyk on behalf of City Of Danbury (Van Katwyk, Danielle)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Johanna G. Zelman on behalf of City Of Danbury (Zelman, Johanna)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Waiver of Service Executed filed by Marlene Moore-Callands, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Marlene Moore-Callands, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, and #1 Complaint filed by Marlene Moore-Callands. Signed by Clerk on 3/5/2019.(Bozek, M.)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 3/4/2019.(Bozek, M.)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/3/2019. Discovery due by 9/3/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 10/8/2019. Signed by Clerk on 3/4/2019.(Bozek, M.)
March 4, 2019 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Oliver, T.)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to City of Danbury waiver sent on 3/4/2019, answer due 5/3/2019 filed by Marlene Moore-Callands. (Williams, John)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of Marlene Moore-Callands (Williams, John)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Danbury ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5179328.), filed by Marlene Moore-Callands.(Williams, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore-Callands v. Danbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Moore-Callands
Represented By: John R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Danbury
Represented By: Johanna G. Zelman
Represented By: Danielle Van Katwyk
Represented By: Jenna M Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?