Williams v. South Park Inn Inc
Plaintiff: Zhakim Williams
Defendant: Jeff Katz and South Park Inn Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00313
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 3601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re #21 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. In the parties' Report, Defendants request a stay of discovery until after an early settlement conference. The Court grants in part and denies in part this request. The parties are to schedule a settlement conference with Judge Richardson at their earliest convenience. The Court expects the parties to use their best efforts to agree upon the earliest possible date for the conference. Once the date is set, the parties are directed to promptly file an agreed upon proposed scheduling order taking into consideration the date of the settlement conference. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/2/2019. (Bryan, Kelsey)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert A. Richardson for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/1/2019. (Bryan, Kelsey)
April 30, 2019 Filing 21 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lavery, David)
April 26, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss by Jeff Katz, South Park Inn Inc.Responses due by 5/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Wragg, Jessica)
March 26, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Zhakim Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reasonable Accommodation Request, #2 Appendix A - Weather Records)(Lavery, David)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' response to the Complaint is now due by 04/26/2019. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/21/2019. (Bryan, Kelsey)
March 21, 2019 Answer deadline updated for defendants to 4/26/2019 per Dkt. 18 Order. (Shafer, J.)
March 20, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Ann Boyce Iassogna on behalf of Jeff Katz, South Park Inn Inc (Iassogna, Patricia Ann)
March 20, 2019 Filing 16 First MOTION for Extension of Time until April 26, 2019 to respond to Complaint #1 Complaint by Jeff Katz, South Park Inn Inc. (Wragg, Jessica)
March 20, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Zieman Wragg on behalf of South Park Inn Inc (Wragg, Jessica)
March 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Zieman Wragg on behalf of Jeff Katz (Wragg, Jessica)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Interpreting Plaintiff's Notice, Dkt. #12 , as a motion for permission to withdraw his Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, Dkt. #2 , as required by Local Rule 83.6(a), the Court grants the request to withdraw the Motion at Dkt. #2 . Accordingly, the hearing on the Motion set for tomorrow, 3/8/2019, is marked off. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/7/2019. (Bryan, Kelsey)
March 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Zhakim Williams re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Kirschner, Greg)
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom Three, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. (Shafer, J.)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court schedules a hearing on Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Dkt. #2 , for 3/8/2019 at 10:00 AM. Plaintiff's counsel must personally hand deliver notice of Friday's hearing on both Defendants no later than 48 hours prior to the hearing. Plaintiff should promptly file proof of service on the docket. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/5/2019. (Bryan, Kelsey)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Jeff Katz, South Park Inn Inc* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David Faber Lavery* *Connecticut Fair Housing Center* *60 Popieluszko Court* *Hartford, CT 06106*. (Velez, F.)
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Zhakim Williams, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Zhakim Williams, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Zhakim Williams, #7 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #6 Standing Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 3/5/2019.(Velez, F.)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/4/2019. (Velez, F.)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/4/19. (Velez, F.)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/4/2019.(Velez, F.)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/3/2019; Discovery due by 9/3/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 10/8/2019. Signed by Clerk on 3/4/2019. (Velez, F.)
March 4, 2019 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Oliver, T.)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David Faber Lavery on behalf of Zhakim Williams (Lavery, David)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Zhakim Williams. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D)(Kirschner, Greg)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5179713.), filed by Zhakim Williams.(Kirschner, Greg)
March 4, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Lavery, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. South Park Inn Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhakim Williams
Represented By: Greg J. Kirschner
Represented By: David Faber Lavery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Katz
Represented By: Jessica Zieman Wragg
Represented By: Patricia Ann Boyce Iassogna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Park Inn Inc
Represented By: Jessica Zieman Wragg
Represented By: Patricia Ann Boyce Iassogna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?