P. v. Yale University, et al
Plaintiff: Z. P.
Defendant: Jane Does, Jonathan Holloway, John Does, Paul Genecin, Yale-New Haven Hospital, Peter Salovey, Lorraine Siggins and Yale University
Case Number: 3:2019cv00315
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Warren W Eginton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Filing 23 Memorandum in Support re #22 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Peter Salovey, Lorraine Siggins, Yale University, Yale-New Haven Hospital. (Noonan, Patrick)
April 22, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss by Peter Salovey, Lorraine Siggins, Yale University, Yale-New Haven Hospital, Paul Genecin and Jonathan Holloway.Responses due by 5/13/2019 (Noonan, Patrick) Modified on 4/23/2019 to correct filers (Caffrey, A.).
March 5, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE TO COUNSEL IN TRANSFERRED CASE. Signed by Clerk on 3/5/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
February 27, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 2/27/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 2/27/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 2/27/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/28/2019. Discovery due by 8/29/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 10/3/201. Signed by Clerk on 2/27/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
February 27, 2019 Filing 16 Case electronically transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 2:18-cv-15703. Modified on 3/5/2019 TO CORRECT THE DATE FILED (Oliver, T.).
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CONSENT ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF CONNECTICUT that Civil Action No. 18-15703 (WJM) (MF) is transferred to the United States district of Connecticut; the Clerk of the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey take all necessary steps to complete the transfer of this action pursuant to this Order. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 2/25/2019. (sm)
February 19, 2019 Filing 14 Letter from Defendants to District Judge Martini. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HALPERN, JAKOB)
February 15, 2019 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document submitted by PETER SALOVEY, PAUL GENECIN, LORRAINE SIGGINS, YALE UNIVERSITY, YALE-NEW HAVEN HOSPITAL has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/22/2019. (sm)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CONSENT ORDER that the deadline by which defendants Yale University, Yale-New Haven Hospital, Peter Salovey, Paul Genecin and Lorrain Siggins may answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is adjourned to 4/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 2/14/2019. (sm)
February 13, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from defendants Yale University, Yale-New Haven Hospital, Peter Salovey, Paul Genecin and Lorraine Siggins to Magistrate Judge Falk. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HALPERN, JAKOB)
February 5, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Z.P.. (DEGROOT, ROBERT)
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Z.P.. YALE-NEW HAVEN HOSPITAL served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/26/2019. (DEGROOT, ROBERT)
February 5, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Z.P.. YALE UNIVERSITY served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (DEGROOT, ROBERT)
February 5, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Z.P.. LORRAINE SIGGINS served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019. (DEGROOT, ROBERT)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Z.P.. PAUL GENECIN served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019. (DEGROOT, ROBERT)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Z.P.. PETER SALOVEY served on 1/18/2019, answer due 2/8/2019. (DEGROOT, ROBERT)
January 30, 2019 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to defendants Yale University and Yale-New Haven Hospital.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HALPERN, JAKOB)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by JAKOB BENJAMIN HALPERN on behalf of PAUL GENECIN, JONATHAN HOLLOWAY, PETER SALOVEY, LORRAINE SIGGINS, YALE UNIVERSITY, YALE-NEW HAVEN HOSPITAL (HALPERN, JAKOB)
January 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM F. MADERER on behalf of PAUL GENECIN, JONATHAN HOLLOWAY, PETER SALOVEY, LORRAINE SIGGINS, YALE UNIVERSITY, YALE-NEW HAVEN HOSPITAL (MADERER, WILLIAM)
January 30, 2019 Clerk`s Text Order - The document submitted by YALE UNIVERSITY, answer due date 2/22/2019; YALE-NEW HAVEN HOSPITAL, answer due date 2/26/2019 has been GRANTED. (sm)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PAUL GENECIN, JONATHAN HOLLOWAY, PETER SALOVEY, LORRAINE SIGGINS, YALE UNIVERSITY, YALE-NEW HAVEN HOSPITAL. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, )
November 6, 2018 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information should always be done in the upper case format, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ld, )
November 5, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. (ak, )
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against YALE UNIVERSITY, YALE- NEW HAVEN HOSPITAL, PETER SALOVEY, PAUL GENECIN, LORRAINE SIGGINS, JONATHAN HOLLOWAY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9150308) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Z.P..(DEGROOT, ROBERT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: P. v. Yale University, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Genecin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yale-New Haven Hospital
Represented By: Patrick M. Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Salovey
Represented By: Patrick M. Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorraine Siggins
Represented By: Patrick M. Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yale University
Represented By: Patrick M. Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Z. P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?