LILLEbaby, LLC v. Columbus Trading Partners USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: LILLEBaby, LLC
Defendant: CYBEX GMBH and COLUMBUS TRADING PARTNERS USA, INC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00329
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 AO 120 Report on the Determination of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Reis, Julia)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 3/12/19. (Tooker, A.)
March 12, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Reis, Julia)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice or preclusive effect by LILLEBaby, LLC.Responses due by 4/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Neborsky, Dawn)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Reis, Julia)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by LILLEBaby, LLC, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by LILLEBaby, LLC, #5 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 3/7/2019.(Reis, Julia)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 3/6/2019.(Reis, Julia)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 3/6/2019.(Reis, Julia)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/5/2019 Discovery due by 9/5/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 10/10/2019 Signed by Clerk on 3/6/2019.(Reis, Julia)
March 6, 2019 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Oliver, T.)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LILLEBaby, LLC disclosing corporate parent LILLEbaby Holding Company, LLC. (Neborsky, Dawn) Modified on 3/7/2019 to edit text to add corporate parent (Walker, J.).
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5183198.), filed by LILLEBaby, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Neborsky, Dawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LILLEbaby, LLC v. Columbus Trading Partners USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LILLEBaby, LLC
Represented By: Dawn M. Neborsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CYBEX GMBH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLUMBUS TRADING PARTNERS USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?