Cruz v. Hartford
Plaintiff: Samuel Cruz
Defendant: City of Hartford
Case Number: 3:2019cv00405
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by City of Hartford.(Lauture, Cynthia)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 GENERAL SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties' Rule 26(f) Planning Report (Doc. #13 ) is hereby APPROVED as modified by this order. All discovery shall be completed by February 1, 2020, and all other interim discovery dates set forth in the parties' Rule 26(f) Report are hereby adopted. A telephonic status conference will be held on November 1, 2019, at 3:30pm. Plaintiff shall initiate call. Once all parties are on the line, please call chambers at (203) 773-2105. Any dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by 30 days after the close of discovery on March 2, 2020, and any response to dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed within 30 days by April 1, 2020. The parties' joint trial memorandum is due by 30 days after the close of discovery on March 2, 2020, or within 30 days of the Court's ruling on dispositive summary judgment motions, whichever date is later. The Court will thereafter set a trial date, and the parties should be prepared to proceed to jury selection within 30 days of the filing of the joint trial memorandum. Please refer to Judge Meyer's webpage on the District of Connecticut website for Judge Meyer's "Instructions for Discovery Disputes" and "Instructions for Joint Trial Memorandum" and "Pretrial Preferences" and "Trial Preferences." The parties are encouraged to commence discovery forthwith and to arrange their schedules in contemplation of the briefing deadlines for any dispositive motions, because the Court is unlikely to grant a future request for an extension of the scheduling order absent extraordinary and unforeseeable circumstances. It is so ordered.Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/19/2019. (Gondwe, N.)
April 18, 2019 Filing 13 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Williams, John)
April 15, 2019 Answer deadline updated for City of Hartford to 5/10/2019. (Gutierrez, Y.)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time until May 10, 2019 to file answer. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/15/2019. (Gutierrez, Y.)
April 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 10, 2019 to file answer by City of Hartford. (Lauture, Cynthia)
April 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia Lauture on behalf of City of Hartford (Lauture, Cynthia)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samuel Cruz. City of Hartford served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (Williams, John)
March 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Samuel Cruz, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Standing Protective Order, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Notice re: Initial Discovery Protocols and #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Samuel Cruz. Signed by Clerk on 03/19/19. (Barry, Donna)
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE re: Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Clerk on 03/18/19. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Barry, Donna)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *City of Hartford* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John R. Williams* *51 Elm Street* *Suite 409* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Barry, Donna)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 03/18/19. (Barry, Donna)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 03/18/19. (Barry, Donna)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/17/2019, Discovery due by 9/17/2019 and Dispositive Motions due by 10/22/2019. Signed by Clerk on 03/18/19. (Barry, Donna)
March 18, 2019 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Oliver, T.)
March 18, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to City of Hartford. (Williams, John)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of Samuel Cruz (Williams, John)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Cruz against City of Hartford ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5197327.), filed by Samuel Cruz.(Williams, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz v. Hartford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Cruz
Represented By: John R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hartford
Represented By: Cynthia Lauture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?