Nettleton v. Mazak Corp
Plaintiff: Craig Nettleton
Defendant: Mazak Corp
Case Number: 3:2019cv00408
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2612
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert D. Hudson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5251402) by Mazak Corp. (Hudson, Robert)
May 17, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Collier on behalf of Mazak Corp (Collier, Katherine)
May 10, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Katherine M. Collier to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5250654) by Mazak Corp. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Carmody, Bryan)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Attorney Robert D. Hudson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/25/2019. Signed by Clerk on 4/26/2019. (Oliver, T.)
April 25, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Robert D. Hudson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5251402) by Mazak Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Proposed Visiting Attorney)(Carmody, Bryan)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Attorney Katherine M. Collier to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/24/2019. Signed by Clerk on 4/25/2019. (Oliver, T.)
April 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Katherine M. Collier to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5250654) by Mazak Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Proposed Visiting Attorney)(Carmody, Bryan)
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mazak Corp. (Carmody, Bryan)
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Mazak Corp.(Carmody, Bryan)
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig Nettleton. Mazak Corp served on 3/25/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Reilly, Michael)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Mazak Corp* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael John Reilly* *Cicchiello & Cicchiello, LLP* *364 Franklin Avenue* *Hartford, CT 06114*. (Fazekas, J.)
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Craig Nettleton Signed by Clerk on 3/18/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 3/18/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 3/18/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/17/2019. Discovery due by 9/17/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 10/22/2019. Signed by Clerk on 3/18/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
March 18, 2019 Judge Stefan R Underhill added. (Anastasio, F.)
March 18, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Mazak Corporation. (Reilly, Michael)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mazak Corp( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5197788.), filed by Craig Nettleton.(Reilly, Michael) Modified on 3/18/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nettleton v. Mazak Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Nettleton
Represented By: Michael John Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mazak Corp
Represented By: Katherine Collier
Represented By: Bryan T. Carmody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?