Doe v. Central Connecticut State University et al

Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Curtis Lollar, Edward Dercole, Central Connecticut State University, Christopher Cervoni, Gregory Sneed and Ramon Baez
Case Number: 3:2019cv00418
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: The #46 motion for extension is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART without prejudice to refiling. The motion is granted as to Defendants CCSU and Cervoni. Defendants CCSU and Cervoni filed a #34 motion to dismiss; accordingly, the answer deadline for these two Defendants has not yet expired under FRCP 12(a)(4)(A). The motion is denied, without prejudice to refiling, as to Defendants Sneed, Dercole, and Baez as their answer deadline has expired. Defendants Sneed, Dercole, and Baez may refile their motion for extension along with an explanation as to why the Court should extend what appears to be an already expired deadline. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 7/15/2019. (Ram, Megha)
July 12, 2019 Filing 46 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until Thirty Days After the Court Issues Its Ruling on the Pending Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint to File Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Ramon Baez, Central Connecticut State University, Christopher Cervoni, Edward Dercole, Gregory Sneed. (Texidor, Carletha)
July 9, 2019 CORRECTED Deadlines as to #34 MOTION to Dismiss Counts One, Two, Three, Nineteen, Twenty and Twenty One against CCSU and Count Thirteen against Cervoni. Responses due by 8/15/2019 (Johnson, D.)
July 9, 2019 ENTERED IN ERROR - Answer deadline updated for Central Connecticut State University to 8/15/2019; Christopher Cervoni to 8/15/2019. (Johnson, D.) Modified on 7/15/2019 (Johnson, D.).
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: The #44 motion for extension is GRANTED. Defendants CCSU and Cervoni shall have until August 15, 2019 to file a reply brief to the Plaintiff's Opposition to their Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 7/9/2019. (Ram, Megha)
July 8, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #34 MOTION to Dismiss Counts One, Two, Three, Nineteen, Twenty and Twenty One against CCSU and Count Thirteen against Cervoni until August 15, 2019 by Central Connecticut State University, Christopher Cervoni. (Texidor, Carletha)
July 2, 2019 Filing 43 Memorandum in Opposition re #34 MOTION to Dismiss Counts One, Two, Three, Nineteen, Twenty and Twenty One against CCSU and Count Thirteen against Cervoni filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Pirrotti, Nina)
June 28, 2019 Filing 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donna F. Martinez: Telephonic conference held on 6/28/2019. The individual defendants are excused from attending the settlement conference on 7/31/19 and the page limit for the parties' ex parte, confidential conference memoranda is extended to 24 pages. 30 minutes. (Constantine, A.)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER & CALENDAR: A conference call is scheduled for Friday, 6/28/2019 at 11:00 AM with Judge Martinez. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call and have opposing counsel on the line when calling chambers at 860 240 3605. (Constantine, A.)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: A settlement conference is scheduled for 7/31/2019 at 11:00 AM in Chambers Room 262, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Donna F. Martinez. Please see attached order for important instructions. (Constantine, A.)
June 5, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #34 MOTION to Dismiss Counts One, Two, Three, Nineteen, Twenty and Twenty One against CCSU and Count Thirteen against Cervoni. Responses due by 7/3/2019 (Johnson, D.)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: The #36 motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Plaintiffs shall have until July 3, 2019 to file a response to the #34 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 6/5/2019. (Ram, Megha)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donna F. Martinez for Settlement Conference Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 5/30/19.(Johnson, D.)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' #35 Rule 26(f) Report. As the parties expressed interest in referral to a Magistrate Judge for settlement discussions, the case is hereby REFERRED to Judge Martinez for a settlement conference. In addition, the Court orders that deadlines set forth in the attached. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 5/30/2019. (Ram, Megha)
May 30, 2019 Filing 36 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #34 MOTION to Dismiss Counts One, Two, Three, Nineteen, Twenty and Twenty One against CCSU and Count Thirteen against Cervoni until July 12, 2019 by Jane Doe. (Lee, Elisabeth)
May 24, 2019 Filing 35 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Pirrotti, Nina)
May 22, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss Counts One, Two, Three, Nineteen, Twenty and Twenty One against CCSU and Count Thirteen against Cervoni by Central Connecticut State University, Christopher Cervoni.Responses due by 6/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint)(Texidor, Carletha)
May 10, 2019 Filing 33 Sealed Document: Amended Complaint (unredacted) by Jane Doe . (Pirrotti, Nina)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: The #2 motion to proceed using the pseudonym "Jane Doe" is GRANTED. The motion is unopposed and satisfies the relevant legal standard set forth in Sealed Plaintiff v. Sealed Defendant #1, 537 F.3d 185 (2d Cir. 2008). Specifically, the Court finds that the litigation involves highly sensitive matters of a personal nature and that identification of the plaintiff poses a risk of harm. The Court further finds that keeping her identity confidential is in the public's interest and will not prejudice the defendants. Finally, her identity has been kept confidential thus far and there do not appear to be alternative mechanisms to protect her confidentiality. The #3 motion to seal is GRANTED. The motion is unopposed and is in accordance with the procedures set forth in Local Rule 5(e). The Court notes that the plaintiff has filed a #30 redacted amended complaint. The plaintiff shall file an unredacted version of the amended complaint under seal. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 5/10/2019. (Ram, Megha)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: The Plaintiff filed an #30 amended complaint in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1)(B). Accordingly, the #29 motion to dismiss is DENIED AS MOOT. If Defendants Central Connecticut State University and Christopher Cervoni renew their motion to dismiss, they may incorporate by reference any prior briefing. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 5/10/2019. (Ram, Megha)
May 9, 2019 Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jane Doe.(Pirrotti, Nina)
April 18, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss Counts One, Two, Three and Thirteen by Central Connecticut State University, Christopher Cervoni.Responses due by 5/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Texidor, Carletha)
April 18, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Carletha S. P. Texidor on behalf of Ramon Baez, Central Connecticut State University, Christopher Cervoni, Edward Dercole, Gregory Sneed IN THEIR INDIVIDUAL CAPACITIES ONLY (Texidor, Carletha)
April 10, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of Curtis Lollar (Williams, John)
April 8, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. Gregory Sneed served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019. (Pirrotti, Nina)
April 8, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. Curtis Lollar served on 4/4/2019, answer due 4/25/2019. (Pirrotti, Nina)
April 8, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. Edward Dercole served on 3/28/2019, answer due 4/18/2019. (Pirrotti, Nina)
April 8, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. Christopher Cervoni served on 3/27/2019, answer due 4/17/2019. (Pirrotti, Nina)
April 8, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. Ramon Baez served on 4/4/2019, answer due 4/25/2019. (Pirrotti, Nina)
April 8, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. Central Connecticut State University served on 3/28/2019, answer due 4/18/2019. (Pirrotti, Nina)
March 21, 2019 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Curtis Lollar* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Nina Therese Pirrotti* *Garrison Levin-Epstein Fitzgerald & Pirrotti PC* *405 Orange St.* *New Haven, CT 06511*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
March 21, 2019 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Gregory Sneed* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Nina Therese Pirrotti* *Garrison Levin-Epstein Fitzgerald & Pirrotti PC* *405 Orange St.* *New Haven, CT 06511*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
March 21, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Edward Dercole* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Nina Therese Pirrotti* *Garrison Levin-Epstein Fitzgerald & Pirrotti PC* *405 Orange St.* *New Haven, CT 06511*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
March 21, 2019 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Christopher Cervoni* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Nina Therese Pirrotti* *Garrison Levin-Epstein Fitzgerald & Pirrotti PC* *405 Orange St.* *New Haven, CT 06511*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
March 21, 2019 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Ramon Baez* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Nina Therese Pirrotti* *Garrison Levin-Epstein Fitzgerald & Pirrotti PC* *405 Orange St.* *New Haven, CT 06511*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
March 21, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Central Connecticut State University* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Nina Therese Pirrotti* *Garrison Levin-Epstein Fitzgerald & Pirrotti PC* *405 Orange St.* *New Haven, CT 06511*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
March 21, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Jane Doe re #10 Notice, [Non-Application of Initial Discovery Protocols] (Goodbaum, Joshua)
March 20, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Central Connecticut State University. (Pirrotti, Nina)
March 20, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Ramon Baez. (Pirrotti, Nina)
March 20, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Christopher Cervoni. (Pirrotti, Nina)
March 20, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Edward Dercole. (Pirrotti, Nina)
March 20, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Gregory Sneed. (Pirrotti, Nina)
March 20, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Curtis Lollar. (Pirrotti, Nina)
March 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Elisabeth Lee on behalf of Jane Doe (Lee, Elisabeth)
March 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua R. Goodbaum on behalf of Jane Doe (Goodbaum, Joshua)
March 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Jane Doe, #5 Sealed Document filed by Jane Doe, #9 Protective Order, #10 Notice, #4 Sealed Document filed by Jane Doe, #2 MOTION for filed by Jane Doe, #8 Electronic Filing Order, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 MOTION to Seal filed by Jane Doe, #6 Sealed Document filed by Jane Doe Signed by Clerk on 3/19/2019.(Reis, Julia)
March 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE re Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 3/19/2019. (Attachments: #2 Initial Discovery Protocols For Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action)(Reis, Julia) Modified on 3/19/2019: attachment 1 entered in error (Reis, Julia).
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 3/19/2019.(Reis, Julia)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 3/19/2019.(Reis, Julia)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/18/2019 Discovery due by 9/18/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 10/23/2019 Signed by Clerk on 3/19/2019.(Reis, Julia)
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 Sealed Document: Unredacted Complaint by Jane Doe (Reis, Julia)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 Sealed Document: Memorandum of Law in Support of #2 Motion to Proceed Using the Pseudonym "Jane Doe" by Jane Doe (Reis, Julia)
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 Sealed Document: Memorandum of Law in Support of #3 Motion to Seal by Jane Doe. (Reis, Julia)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Seal by Jane Doe. (Reis, Julia)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Using the Pseudonym "Jane Doe" by Jane Doe. (Reis, Julia)
March 19, 2019 Filing fee received from Nina T. Pirrotti: $400, receipt number CTXN00018919 (Reis, Julia)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 Redacted COMPLAINT against Central Connecticut State University, Curtis Lollar, Gregory Sneed, Edward Dercole, Christopher Cervoni, Ramon Baez, filed by Jane Doe.(Reis, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Central Connecticut State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Lollar
Represented By: John R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Dercole
Represented By: Carletha S. P. Texidor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Connecticut State University
Represented By: Carletha S. P. Texidor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Cervoni
Represented By: Carletha S. P. Texidor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Sneed
Represented By: Carletha S. P. Texidor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramon Baez
Represented By: Carletha S. P. Texidor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Nina Therese Pirrotti
Represented By: Elisabeth Lee
Represented By: Joshua R. Goodbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?