Allstate Insurance Company v. Tenn et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: Tailan Moscaritolo and Donte Tenn
Case Number: 3:2019cv00432
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Wojcik, Michele)
July 2, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Pre-Filing Conference by Donte Tenn. (Johnson, Ronald)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #15 Motion to Dismiss, without prejudice to renew, for failure to comply with the Court's pre-filing conference requirement [see Pre-Trial Preferences]. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 6/28/19. (Tooker, A.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Tailan Moscaritolo.(Donovan, Eamon)
June 25, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Donte Tenn.Responses due by 7/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Johnson, Ronald)
May 29, 2019 Answer deadline updated for All Defendants. (Tooker, A.)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time ; granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time, on consent, to June 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 5/29/19. (Tooker, A.)
May 28, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until 06/28/2019 TO PLEAD by Tailan Moscaritolo. (Donovan, Eamon)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint by Donte Tenn. (Johnson, Ronald)
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald S. Johnson on behalf of Donte Tenn (Johnson, Ronald)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Eamon T. Donovan on behalf of Tailan Moscaritolo (Donovan, Eamon)
May 13, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. Tailan Moscaritolo served on 5/6/2019, answer due 5/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wojcik, Michele)
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. Donte Tenn served on 4/4/2019, answer due 4/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wojcik, Michele)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Insurance Company. (Wojcik, Michele)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Tailan Moscaritolo, Donte Tenn* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michele C. Wojcik* *Nuzzo & Roberts, LLC* *One Town Center, PO Box 747* *Cheshire, CT 06410*. (Reis, Julia)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Allstate Insurance Company, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 3/25/2019.(Reis, Julia)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 3/25/2019.(Reis, Julia)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 3/25/2019.(Reis, Julia)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/24/2019 Discovery due by 9/24/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 10/29/2019 Signed by Clerk on 3/25/2019.(Reis, Julia)
March 25, 2019 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Anastasio, F.)
March 25, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Wojcik, Michele)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5206356.), filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wojcik, Michele)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company v. Tenn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tailan Moscaritolo
Represented By: Eamon T. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donte Tenn
Represented By: Ronald S. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Michele C. Wojcik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?