Funny 4 Funds, LLC v. Treehouse Comedy Productions, Ltd. et al

Plaintiff: Funny 4 Funds, LLC
Defendant: Treehouse Comedy Productions, Ltd. and Brad Axelrod
Case Number: 3:2019cv00439
Filed: March 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 40 AO 120 Report on the Determination of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Gould, K.)
June 28, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Gould, K.)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER CLOSING CASE. This case has been reported settled. Rather than continue to keep the case open on the docket, the Clerk is directed to administratively close the file without prejudice to reopening on or before October 28, 2019. If the Parties wish to file a Stipulation of Dismissal (for approval by the Court or simply for inclusion in the Court's file), they may do so on or before October 28, 2019. The dates set forth in this order may be extended for good cause pursuant to a motion filed in accordance with Local Rule 7. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/27/2019.(Beyerlein, Alexis)
June 27, 2019 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam: Settlement Conference held on 6/27/2019. Case reported settled. (On the record 9 minutes, Total time 4 hrs)(Court Reporter FTR - CR4.) (Caffrey, A.)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: A settlement conference is scheduled for Thursday, June 27, 2019, from 11:00AM to 3:00PM. A Settlement Conference Order entered on May 13, 2019 (Doc. #36 ), setting mandatory pre-conference and settlement conference requirements and interim deadlines. These deadlines, including the deadline for submission of ex parte statements, are set forth in detail in the Order. The parties are reminded that compliance with the Order is mandatory. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 6/3/2019. (Katz, S.)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER. The attached Order sets forth detailed instructions and deadlines for a settlement conference scheduled in this case. All counsel must read the attached Order and provide a copy to their clients. Compliance with all deadlines and conditions set forth in the Order is mandatory. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 5/13/2019. (Katz, S.)
May 13, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement Conference set for 6/27/2019 from 11:00AM to 3:00PM in Courtroom Four, 141 Church Street, New Haven, CT before Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam. (Katz, S.)
May 13, 2019 Filing 34 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam: Pre-Settlement Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 5/13/2019. A settlement conference has been scheduled for Thursday, June 27, 2019, from 11:00AM to 3:00PM. A separate calendar and settlement conference order will issue. 10 minutes. (Katz, S.)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph Novick. Signed by Clerk on 5/13/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
May 10, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph Novick to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5275327) by Brad Axelrod, Treehouse Comedy Productions, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Corea, Andy)
May 3, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 5/13/2019, at 4:30PM, before Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam. This case has been referred to Judge Merriam for a settlement conference. She will hold a pre-conference telephone call with counsel on 5/13/2019, at 4:30PM. A firm date for the settlement conference will be set during that telephone call. The Court requires all named parties and any other persons necessary to achieve full settlement (such as insurance representatives) to attend the settlement conference in person. Therefore, counsel must consult with their clients and other necessary parties prior to the telephone call to determine any dates on which they will be unavailable in the next 120 days. Counsel should also have their own calendars available to facilitate scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference for the conference to be productive. Please use the following dial-in for this call: (888)278-0296; Access Code: 2280867. (Katz, S.)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/3/2019.(Gould, K.)
May 3, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Brad Axelrod to 7/20/2019; Treehouse Comedy Productions, Ltd. to 7/20/2019. (Gould, K.)
May 3, 2019 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kari A. Dooley: Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/3/2019. The answer deadline is continued to 7/20/2019. Total Time: 8 minutes (Gould, K.)
April 25, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference re #2 MOTION for Prejudgment Disclosure of Property and Assets set for 5/3/2019 at 12:00 PM before Judge Kari A. Dooley. Telephonic Conference Line: 888-278-0296; Access Code: 80-77-899. (Beyerlein, Alexis)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #2 Motion for Prejudgment Remedy. See attached Ruling. A telephonic conference will be scheduled forthwith concerning #2 MOTION for Prejudgment Disclosure of Property and Assets. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 4/25/2019. (Beyerlein, Alexis)
April 23, 2019 Filing 26 Marked Exhibit List from PJR hearing 4/23/2019 by Funny 4 Funds, LLC. (Gould, K.)
April 23, 2019 Filing 25 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Kari A. Dooley: taking under advisement #2 Motion for Prejudgment Remedy; Motion Hearing held on 4/23/2019 re #2 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy MOTION for Disclosure filed by Funny 4 Funds, LLC ; Evidentiary Hearing held on 4/23/2019. Total Time: 1 hours and 21 minutes(Court Reporter Traci Walker.) (Gould, K.)
April 10, 2019 Answer deadline updated for All Defendants. Responsive pleading due 5/20/2019.(Beyerlein, Alexis)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Responsive pleading due 5/20/2019. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 4/10/2019. (Beyerlein, Alexis)
April 10, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 4/11/2019 at 10:00 AM MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy #2 Hearing set for 4/23/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom Four-Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Kari A. Dooley (Beyerlein, Alexis)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting in part #19 Motion to Continue Prejudgment Remedy Hearing. The hearing is hereby reset for 4/23/2019 at 10 AM. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 4/10/2019. (Beyerlein, Alexis)
April 10, 2019 Filing 21 OBJECTION re #19 MOTION to Continue Prejudgment Remedy Hearing filed by Funny 4 Funds, LLC. (Rosenberg, David)
April 10, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 18, 2019 to Respond to #1 Complaint by Brad Axelrod, Treehouse Comedy Productions, Ltd.. (Corea, Andy)
April 10, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Continue Prejudgment Remedy Hearing by Brad Axelrod, Treehouse Comedy Productions, Ltd.. (Corea, Andy)
April 9, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Treehouse Comedy Productions, Ltd.. (Corea, Andy)
April 9, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A Ciarleglio on behalf of Brad Axelrod, Treehouse Comedy Productions, Ltd. (Ciarleglio, Matthew)
April 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Andy I. Corea on behalf of Brad Axelrod, Treehouse Comedy Productions, Ltd. (Corea, Andy)
April 3, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Funny 4 Funds, LLC. Brad Axelrod served on 3/29/2019, answer due 4/19/2019. (Rosenberg, David)
April 3, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Funny 4 Funds, LLC. Treehouse Comedy Productions, Ltd. served on 3/28/2019, answer due 4/18/2019. (Rosenberg, David)
March 27, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Brad Axelrod, Treehouse Comedy Productions, Ltd.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David E. Rosenberg* *Gambardella Cipriano Gottlieb & Hathaway* *60 Washington Avenue Suite 104* *Hamden, CT 06518*. (Fanelle, N.)
March 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy #2 Hearing set for 4/11/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom Four-Annex, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Kari A. Dooley (Gould, K.)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Hearing ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 3/26/2019.(Gould, K.)
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Summons (Gould, K.)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 3/26/2019. (Gould, K.)
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy MOTION for Disclosure by Funny 4 Funds, LLC.Responses due by 4/16/2019 (Rosenberg, David)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed. (Fanelle, N.)
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Protective Order, #2 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy MOTION for Disclosure filed by Funny 4 Funds, LLC, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Funny 4 Funds, LLC Signed by Clerk on 3/26/2019.(Fanelle, N.)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 3/26/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 3/26/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/25/2019 Discovery due by 9/25/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 10/30/2019 Signed by Clerk on 3/26/2019.(Fanelle, N.)
March 26, 2019 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Oliver, T.)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Prejudgment Remedy by Funny 4 Funds, llc. (Rosenberg, David). Added MOTION for Prejudgment Disclosure of Property and Assets on 3/26/2019 (Walker, J.).
March 26, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Rosenberg, David)
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5208593.), filed by Funny 4 Funds, llc.(Rosenberg, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Funny 4 Funds, LLC v. Treehouse Comedy Productions, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Funny 4 Funds, LLC
Represented By: David E. Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treehouse Comedy Productions, Ltd.
Represented By: Matthew A Ciarleglio
Represented By: Andy I. Corea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Axelrod
Represented By: Matthew A Ciarleglio
Represented By: Andy I. Corea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?