Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Reddy
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Defendant: Walter Reddy, III
Case Number: 3:2019cv00460
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Referring Judge: William I Garfinkel
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company.Responses due by 7/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibits to Memorandum in Support)(Ventre, Peter)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter A. Ventre on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company (Ventre, Peter)
May 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Walter Reddy, III. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Fazekas, J.)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis for the reasons stated in the attached Ruling. If Plaintiff wishes to renew his motion, he may file a compete financial affidavit within thirty (30) days. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 4/2/19. (Cates, S)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William I. Garfinkel for #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/29/2019.(Washington, Gregory)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/27/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/27/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/26/2019. Discovery due by 9/26/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 10/31/2019. Signed by Clerk on 3/27/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Walter Reddy, III. (Fazekas, J.)
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walter Reddy, III from Superior Court, Norwalk, case number NWH-CV-18-6004197-S., filed by Walter Reddy, III. (Attachments: #1 Revised State Complaint)(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Reddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Reddy, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Jennifer M Jason
Represented By: Peter A. Ventre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?