Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Go Big LLC et al

Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Paul Simon Music, Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Zawinul Music, Cotillion Music, Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corp., Rondor Music Intl Inc and Dandelion Music Co.
Defendant: Go Big LLC, Social and Brian Stradczuk
Case Number: 3:2019cv00473
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Rondor Music Intl Inc, Dandelion Music Co., Paul Simon Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., Zawinul Music. Brian Stradczuk served on 4/5/2019, answer due 4/26/2019. (Rye, Michael)
April 12, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Rondor Music Intl Inc, Dandelion Music Co., Paul Simon Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., Zawinul Music. Go Big LLC served on 4/5/2019, answer due 4/26/2019. (Rye, Michael)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed. E-mail sent to the copyright office. (Attachments: #1 complaint and attachment) (Murphy, Tatihana)
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Brian Stradczuk* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael J. Rye* *Cantor Colburn LLP - Htfd* *20 Church Street, 22nd Floor* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Go Big LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael J. Rye* *Cantor Colburn LLP - Htfd* *20 Church Street, 22nd Floor* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Murphy, Tatihana)
April 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Dandelion Music Co., Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corp., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Rondor Music Intl Inc, Zawinul Music, Paul Simon Music, Cotillion Music, Inc., #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 04/01/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 03/29/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Clerk on 03/29/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/28/2019. Discovery due by 9/28/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/2/2019. Signed by Clerk on 03/29/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
March 29, 2019 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Anastasio, F.)
March 29, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Go Big LLC. (Rye, Michael)
March 29, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Brian Stradczuk. (Rye, Michael)
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Go Big LLC, Brian Stradczuk ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5214850.), filed by Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Rondor Music Intl Inc, Dandelion Music Co., Paul Simon Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Cotillion Music, Inc., Zawinul Music. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Song Schedule)(Rye, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Go Big LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Go Big LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Stradczuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Simon Music
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Screen Gems-EMI Music, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony/ATV Songs LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zawinul Music
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cotillion Music, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stone Diamond Music Corp.
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondor Music Intl Inc
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dandelion Music Co.
Represented By: Michael J. Rye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?